This case was last updated from PACER on 04/24/2020 at 08:15:20 (UTC).

Glass v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 Glass filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eleanor L. Ross and Justin S. Anand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00845

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

Referral Judge

Justin S. Anand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Libby P. Glass

Defendant

JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard S. Alembik

Attorney at Richard S. Alembik, PC

315 West Ponce De Leon Avenue, Suite 250

Decatur, GA 30030

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Hobart Schneider

Attorney at Weissman, P.C.

One Alliance Center, 4Th Floor, 3500 Lenox Road

Atlanta, GA 30326

Gregory Scott Krivo

Attorney at McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce LLC - Roswell

1544 Old Alabama Road

Roswell, GA 30076-2102

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Hobart Schneider on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association (Schneider, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#25

(#25) NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's #22 First Amended and Restated Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint and Jury Demand (Schneider, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/14/2020 to add document link and edit text (jap). (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#24

(#24) Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

23 #1

Brief in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss

#23

(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness filed by Libby P. Glass. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Alembik, Richard) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#22

(#22) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Associationwith Jury Demand filed by Libby P. Glass.(Alembik, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#21

(#21) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: Plaintiff's #6 Application for an Interlocutory (i.e., preliminary) Injunction is GRANTED, and that every named defendant in this action, and any defendant that may be joined or substituted into this action in the future, be and hereby are ENJOINED and RESTRAINED as directed herein. (See order for specifics.) Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/30/2020. (jap) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

13 #1

Brief

#13

(#18) ORDER granting the #14 Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines Pending Ruling on #13 Motion to Dismiss. (See order for specifics.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 03/23/20. (aaq) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

6 #2

Brief OF AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF LIBBY P. GLASS F

6 #1

Exhibit "A" --- CERTIFICATE OF ATTORNEY FOR APPLICANT

#5

(#5) ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's request for a Temporary Restraining order and/or Preliminary Injunction as found in her #1 Complaint and REFERS this CASE to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand pursuant to Standing Order 18-01. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 2/25/20. (jpa) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#4

Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Libby P. Glass. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (jpa) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#5) ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's request for a Temporary Restraining order and/or Preliminary Injunction as found in her #1 Complaint and REFERS this CASE to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand pursuant to Standing Order 18-01. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 2/25/20. (jpa) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #13 MOTION to Dismiss to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (jap) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Hobart Schneider on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association (Schneider, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's #22 First Amended and Restated Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint and Jury Demand (Schneider, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/14/2020 to add document link and edit text (jap). (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness filed by Libby P. Glass. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Alembik, Richard) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Associationwith Jury Demand filed by Libby P. Glass.(Alembik, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: Plaintiff's #6 Application for an Interlocutory (i.e., preliminary) Injunction is GRANTED, and that every named defendant in this action, and any defendant that may be joined or substituted into this action in the future, be and hereby are ENJOINED and RESTRAINED as directed herein. (See order for specifics.) Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/30/2020. (jap) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PROPOSED CONSENT Preliminary Injunction re: #12 Order on Motion for TRO. (Alembik, Richard) Modified on 3/30/2020 to edit text (jap). (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jap) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting the #14 Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines Pending Ruling on #13 Motion to Dismiss. (See order for specifics.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 03/23/20. (aaq) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE Regarding the Citizenship of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #7 Order by Libby P. Glass (Alembik, Richard) Modified on 2/28/2020 to edit text (jap). (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Libby P. Glass. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SCHEDULING a hearing for 3/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1708 before Judge Eleanor L. Ross on the #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Defendant must file on the docket a response to Plaintiff's motion by 3/1/20 at 5:00 p.m. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice indicating the citizenship of Defendant by 2/27/20. Failure to comply with the Court's order will result in the cancellation of the scheduled hearing. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 2/26/20. (jpa) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED with Brief In Support by Libby P. Glass. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" --- CERTIFICATE OF ATTORNEY FOR APPLICANT, #2 Brief OF AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF LIBBY P. GLASS FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND FOR AN INTERLOCUTORY INJUNCTION, #3 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING)(Alembik, Richard) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's request for a Temporary Restraining order and/or Preliminary Injunction as found in her #1 Complaint and REFERS this CASE to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand pursuant to Standing Order 18-01. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 2/25/20. (jpa) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by Libby P. Glass. (Alembik, Richard) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 Complaint regarding injunctive relief, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (jpa) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Libby P. Glass. Request for Preliminary Injunction included. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9406304) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less