Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2020 at 13:16:47 (UTC).

Glander International Bunkering Inc. v. Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 Glander International Bunkering Inc filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Bouchard Transportation Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02292

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Glander International Bunkering Inc.

Defendants

Tug Frederick E. Bouchard

Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc.

Garnishees

PBF Energy Company LLC

Valero Refining Company

Valero Refining and Marketing Company

PBF Energy, Inc.

Delaware City Refining Company LLC

PBF Energy Partners LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Jay Houseal

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Glander International Bunkering Inc. as to Defendant Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc. and all Garnishees (Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #6 for Order for Warrant of Arrest. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/18/19. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/18/19. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#10

(#10) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment to PBF Energy Company LLC by Glander International Bunkering Inc. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#9

(#9) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment to Valero Refining and Marketing Company - filed by Glander International Bunkering Inc. (rwc) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/18/2019) (rwc). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#6

(#18) ORDER granting #6 for Order for Warrant of Arrest. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/18/19. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#17) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/18/19. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION and MEMORANDUM for Appointment of Substitute Custodian - filed by Glander International Bunkering Inc. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION and MEMORANDUM for Appointment for Service of Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment - filed by Glander International Bunkering Inc. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #2

Letter Requesting Expedited Handling

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT WITH REQUEST FOR RULE C ARREST AND MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT - filed against Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc., Tug Frederick E. Bouchard - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2804834.) - filed by Glander International Bunkering Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter Requesting Expedited Handling)(rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) USM 285 Returned Unexecuted as to Tug Frederick E. Bouchard. (sam) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Glander International Bunkering Inc. as to Defendant Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc. and all Garnishees (Houseal, Timothy) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) USM 285 Returned Unexecuted as to Tug Frederick E. Bouchard. (rwc) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketRemark : Exit three original signed warrants to USM with certified copies of DI#'s 16 & 18. Exit three original copies of each of the six Writs of Attachment to counsel. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketRemark : Case submitted for routine judicial case assignment. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketWARRANT of Arrest in rem issued. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketWRITS OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Delaware City Refining Company LLC, PBF Energy Company LLC, PBF Energy Partners LP, PBF Energy, Inc., Valero Refining Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #6 for Order for Warrant of Arrest. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/18/19. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/18/19. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment to PBF Energy Company LLC by Glander International Bunkering Inc. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment to Valero Refining and Marketing Company - filed by Glander International Bunkering Inc. (rwc) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/18/2019) (rwc). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment to PBF Energy Partners LP - filed by Glander International Bunkering Inc. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment to Delaware City Refining Company LLC filed by Glander International Bunkering Inc. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION and MEMORANDUM for Order for Warrant of Arrest - filed by Glander International Bunkering Inc. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION and MEMORANDUM for Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment - filed by Glander International Bunkering Inc. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION and MEMORANDUM for Appointment of Substitute Custodian - filed by Glander International Bunkering Inc. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION and MEMORANDUM for Appointment for Service of Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment - filed by Glander International Bunkering Inc. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT WITH REQUEST FOR RULE C ARREST AND MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT - filed against Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc., Tug Frederick E. Bouchard - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2804834.) - filed by Glander International Bunkering Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter Requesting Expedited Handling)(rwc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PBF Energy Partners LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Glander International Bunkering is a litigant

Latest cases where Valero Refining & Marketing Co is a litigant

Latest cases where PBF ENERGY LIMITED is a litigant