This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2020 at 07:48:50 (UTC).

Gjonbalaj v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et. al.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 Gjonbalaj filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07165

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sokol Gjonbalaj

Defendants

Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Volkswagen AG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mitchell M. Breit

Attorney at Simmons Hanly Conroy

12 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016-7416

Jason Barnes

Attorney at Simmons Hanly Conroy

231 S. Bemiston Ave., Ste #525

St. Louis, MO 63105

Thien An Vinh Truong

Attorney at Simmons Hanly Conroy

112 Madison Avenue, Ste 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Brittany Boswell

Attorney at Simmons Hanly Conroy

112 Madison Avenue, Ste 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Viceas to Brittany A. Boswell. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/24/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

11 #2

Proposed Order

11 #1

Affidavit

#11

(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brittany A. Boswell Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12293475. by Sokol Gjonbalaj. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Boswell, Brittany) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jay Barnes. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/22/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

9 #2

Proposed Order

9 #1

Affidavit

#9

(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jay Barnes Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12282480. by Sokol Gjonbalaj. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Barnes, Jason) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#8

(#8) Letter Request for Extension of Time by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Carr, Brian) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Thien An Vinh Truong on behalf of Sokol Gjonbalaj (aty to be noticed) (Truong, Thien An) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 2/11/2020 at 11:30 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/26/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

5 #1

Summons-Volkswagen AG

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Volkswagen AG) (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

3 #1

Additional Quality Control Check Sheet

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 12/23/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2019: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Sokol Gjonbalaj (Breit, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Viceas to Brittany A. Boswell. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/24/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brittany A. Boswell Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12293475. by Sokol Gjonbalaj. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Boswell, Brittany) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jay Barnes. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/22/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jay Barnes Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12282480. by Sokol Gjonbalaj. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Barnes, Jason) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER re: #8 Letter Request for Extension of Time. Request granted, defendant's time to file its answer is extended to 3/15/2020. The Initial Status Conference is adjourned to 3/18/2020 at 5:00 pm in Chambers 704S and the parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference set forth at #6 . In addition, counsel is advised that since this letter seeks relief from the Court, it should have been designated as an ECF event Letter "Motion". Do not refile the letter. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/17/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter Request for Extension of Time by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Carr, Brian) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearing Time: Initial Status Conference previously set at 11:30 am on 2/11/2020 is reset to 12:30 PM in Chambers 704S. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Thien An Vinh Truong on behalf of Sokol Gjonbalaj (aty to be noticed) (Truong, Thien An) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 2/11/2020 at 11:30 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/26/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Volkswagen AG) (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 12/23/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2019: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Sokol Gjonbalaj (Breit, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM - please answer all questions). Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12183583 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Sokol Gjonbalaj. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Breit, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less