This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/01/2021 at 09:03:08 (UTC).

Giviens v. Gujaraidze et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Giviens filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Gujaraidze. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00184

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Giviens

Defendants

CTS Express, Inc.

Zviad Gujaraidze

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William J. Mitchell, II

Attorney at Gordon McKernan Injury Attorneys

5656 Hilton Avenue

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Defendant Attorneys

Scott S. McCormick

Attorney at Organ & Associates

909 Poydras St., Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Coleman Taylor Organ

Attorney at Bastian & Associates

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Michael J. Madere

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT D. FORD

111 Veterans Memorial Blvd., Suite 1670

Metairie, LA 70005

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) STATUS REPORT by David Giviens. (Mitchell, William) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CTS Express, Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(McCormick, Scott) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/6/2021. (BLR) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

2 #5

Attachment Proposed Order

2 #4

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

2 #3

Exhibit State court pleadings

2 #2

Exhibit A-email from counsel

2 #1

Proposed Pleading;

#2

(#2) MOTION to Substitute #1 Notice of Removal by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Exhibit A-email from counsel, #3 Exhibit State court pleadings, #4 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Attachment Proposed Order)(McCormick, Scott) Modified on 4/5/2021 to link the entries (KMW). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Exhibit A-email from counsel

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 705633. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2269486), filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-email from counsel, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCormick, Scott) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/7/2021) (EDC). Modified on 4/7/2021 in accordance with record document 3. (EDC). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE AND ORDER: In light of defendant Zviad Gujaraidze having not made an appearance in this matter, a revised Joint Status Report is now due by 6/10/2021. Scheduling Conference reset for 6/24/2021 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/13/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATUS REPORT by David Giviens. (Mitchell, William) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CTS Express, Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(McCormick, Scott) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/6/2021. (BLR) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Substitute #1 Notice of Removal. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 1 with 2-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/6/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Substitute #1 Notice of Removal by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Exhibit A-email from counsel, #3 Exhibit State court pleadings, #4 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Attachment Proposed Order)(McCormick, Scott) Modified on 4/5/2021 to link the entries (KMW). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 705633. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2269486), filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-email from counsel, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCormick, Scott) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/7/2021) (EDC). Modified on 4/7/2021 in accordance with record document 3. (EDC). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA is a litigant