This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2022 at 14:16:00 (UTC).

GIUNTINI v. WALMART STORES EAST LP

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 GIUNTINI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART STORES EAST LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is TILMAN E SELF, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00323

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TILMAN E SELF, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BETTY J GIUNTINI

Defendant

WALMART STORES EAST LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL JORDAN ELLIS JOSEY, JR

6055 Lakeside Commons Dr Ste 400

Macon, GA 31210

Defendant Attorney

ERNEST L BEATON, IV

3445 Peachtree St Ne Ste 500

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A (Pleadings)

1 #2

Exhibit B (email)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Jurisdictional Statement by WAL-MART STORES INC (BEATON, ERNEST) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART STORES EAST LP identifying Corporate Parent WALMART INC, Other Affiliate WSE MANAGEMENT LLC, Other Affiliate WSE INVESTMENT LLC, Other Affiliate WAL-MART STORES EAST, LLC. for WALMART STORES EAST LP. (BEATON, ERNEST) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Required Form

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 4/20/2023. Dispositive motions due by 5/22/2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 10/11/2022. (chc) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/12/2022) (tam). (Entered: 10/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 4/20/2023. Dispositive motions due by 5/22/2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 10/11/2022. (chc) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/12/2022) (tam). (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/20/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 9/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(chc) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/20/2022) (tlf). (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART STORES EAST LP identifying Corporate Parent WALMART INC, Other Affiliate WSE MANAGEMENT LLC, Other Affiliate WSE INVESTMENT LLC, Other Affiliate WAL-MART STORES EAST, LLC. for WALMART STORES EAST LP. (BEATON, ERNEST) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by WALMART STORES EAST LP ); All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1.(tam) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Jurisdictional Statement by WAL-MART STORES INC (BEATON, ERNEST) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against BETTY J GIUTINI Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4177460, $402 filed by WAL-MART STORES INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Pleadings), #2 Exhibit B (Plaintiff's Counsel Email to Defendant's Counsel), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case.(BEATON, ERNEST) Modified on 9/7/2022 (tam). (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ernest L. Beaton, IV