This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2022 at 11:04:14 (UTC).

Giuffre v. Dershowitz

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 Giuffre filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Dershowitz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Loretta A. Preska. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03377

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Loretta A. Preska

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

VIRGINIA L. GIUFFRE

Defendants

Alan M. Dershowitz

Alan Dershowitz

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Alan Dershowitz

Interested Parties

Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

Leslie H. Wexner

John W Zeiger

Netflix, Inc.

RadicalMedia LLC

Leroy & Morton Productions LLC

Lisa Bryant

Joseph Berlinger

President and Fellows of Harvard College

Not Classified By Court

Sharon Churcher

Intervenors

Miami Herald Media Company

Julie Brown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Joshua Schiller

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Sigrid S. McCawley

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP

401 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Haley N Proctor

Attorney at Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Charles J Cooper

Attorney at Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Michael W. Kirk

Attorney at Cooper & Kirk, PLLC (DC)

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Nicole J Moss

Attorney at Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Imran H. Ansari

Attorney at Aidala Bertuna & Kamins PC

546 Fifth Avenue, Ste 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Arthur Louis Aidala

Attorney at Law Offices of Aidala & Bertuna, P.C.

8118-13Th Avenue

Brooklyn, NY 11228

Christian Kiely

Attorney at Todd & Weld LLP

1 Federal Street, Ste 27Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Howard M. Cooper

Attorney at Todd & Weld LLP

One Federal St., 27Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Kristine Chappen Oren

Attorney at Todd & Weld LLP

1 Federal Street, Ste 27Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Taylor Friedman

Attorney at Elefterakis Elefterakis & Panek

80 Pine Street, 38Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

John M. Leventhal

Attorney at Aidala Bertuna & Kamins PC

546 Fifth Avenue, Ste 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Barry Kamins

Attorney at Aidala, Bertuna & Kamins P.C.

546 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10036

Interested Party Attorneys

Marion H. Little, Jr.,

Attorney at Zieger, Tigges & Little, LLP

41 South High Street, Suite 3500

Columbus, OH 43215

Rachel Fan Stern Strom

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 21St Floor

New York, NY 10020

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Eric Joel Feder

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

1301 K Street Nw, Suite 500 East

Washington, DC 20005

Laura R. Handman

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

1301 K Street, Nw, Suite 500 East

Washington, DC 20005

Intervenor Attorneys

Cynthia Gierhart

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

800 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20006

Christine Walz

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

31 W. 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#500

(#500) LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christian G. Kiely dated July 19, 2022 re: Response to Plaintiff's Request for Pre-Motion Discovery Conference (ECF No. 494). Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#499

(#499) LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 07/18/2022 re: Proposed Trial Schedule re #481 ORDER and #483 ORDER. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#498

(#498) LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christian G. Kiely dated July 18, 2022 re: Response to Court's Order (ECF No. 481) Regarding Case Schedule. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#497

RESTRICTED

#496

(#496) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Letter Under Seal addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 07/18/2022. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

494 #5

Exhibit E - Def. Dershowitzs Answers to Pl. Giuffres Second Set of Interrogatori

494 #3

Exhibit C - Pl's Second Set of Interrogatories (May 9, 2022)

#483

(#497) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 07/18/2022 re: Proposed Trial Schedule re #481 ORDER and #483 ORDER. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre, Alan Dershowitz.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #496 .(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#481

(#497) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 07/18/2022 re: Proposed Trial Schedule re #481 ORDER and #483 ORDER. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre, Alan Dershowitz.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #496 .(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

1 #16

Exhibit 16_Article

1 #13

Exhibit 13_Affidavit

1 #9

Exhibit 9_Article

1 #8

Exhibit 8_Article

1 #6

Exhibit 6_Social Media Post

1 #3

Exhibit 3_Article

1 #2

Exhibit 2_Article

1 #1

Exhibit 1_Article

#1

782 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 7/21/2022. (Court Reporter Sadie Herbert) (mph) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#500) LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christian G. Kiely dated July 19, 2022 re: Response to Plaintiff's Request for Pre-Motion Discovery Conference (ECF No. 494). Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#499) LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 07/18/2022 re: Proposed Trial Schedule re #481 ORDER and #483 ORDER. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#498) LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christian G. Kiely dated July 18, 2022 re: Response to Court's Order (ECF No. 481) Regarding Case Schedule. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#497) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 07/18/2022 re: Proposed Trial Schedule re #481 ORDER and #483 ORDER. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre, Alan Dershowitz.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #496 .(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#496) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Letter Under Seal addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 07/18/2022. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#495) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #494 Letter,, filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant shall respond no later than July 19 at 5:00 p.m. The parties shall be prepared to discuss at the July 21 videoconference. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/15/2022) (ate) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#494) LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 07/14/2022 re: Request for Pre-Motion Discovery Conference. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted Email from Howard Cooper to Charles Cooper and Michael Kirk (Apr. 22, 2022), #2 Exhibit B - Pl's Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents (May 9, 2022), #3 Exhibit C - Pl's Second Set of Interrogatories (May 9, 2022), #4 Exhibit D - Def. Dershowitzs Objections and Resps. To Pl. Giuffres Fourth Set of Requests for Production (June 22, 2022), #5 Exhibit E - Def. Dershowitzs Answers to Pl. Giuffres Second Set of Interrogatories (June 22, 2022)).(Moss, Nicole) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#493) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated 07/12/2022 re: Response to plaintiffs 7-5-22 letter (corrected filing). Document filed by Alan Dershowitz, Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #492 .(Cooper, Howard) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#492) ORDER granting #490 Letter Motion to Seal. The request is granted. This motion (dkt. no. 490) shall be marked as closed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/12/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
515 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Imran H. Ansari on behalf of Alan Dershowitz. (Ansari, Imran) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alan Dershowitz. (pc) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Schiller. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand $75,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 3 (Citizen or Subject of a Foreign Country); the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (pc) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua Schiller. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: VIRGINIA L. GIUFFRE, Alan M. Dershowitz. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schiller, Joshua) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALAN DERSHOWITZ, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by VIRGINIA L. GIUFFRE. (Schiller, Joshua) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Alan M. Dershowitz. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16706500)Document filed by VIRGINIA L. GIUFFRE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_Article, #2 Exhibit 2_Article, #3 Exhibit 3_Article, #4 Exhibit 4_Article, #5 Exhibit 5_Article, #6 Exhibit 6_Social Media Post, #7 Exhibit 7_Letter, #8 Exhibit 8_Article, #9 Exhibit 9_Article, #10 Exhibit 10_Article, #11 Exhibit 11_Article, #12 Exhibit 12_Affidavit, #13 Exhibit 13_Affidavit, #14 Exhibit 14_Affidavit, #15 Exhibit 15_E-Mail, #16 Exhibit 16_Article)(Schiller, Joshua) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RADICALMEDIA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Miami Herald Media Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Boies Schiller Flexner LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where NETFLIX INC is a litigant