This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 07:46:37

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability case was filed by GIUDICE against SAM'S WEST, INC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 3:19-CV-17103
  • Filing Date 08/23/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Personal Injury - Other Product Liability
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Zahid N. Quraishi
  • Courthouse New Jersey District

Party Details

  • Defendant JOHN DOES 1-10
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant ABC CORPS. 1-10
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff MARTHA GIUDICE
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant WIN-HOLT EQUIPMENT CORP
  • Represented By
    • PETER K. BARBER
  • Defendant SAM'S WEST, INC
  • Represented By
    • CHRISTINA MARIE MATTEO

Court Documents

6 #3

Exhibit C

Fees Apply
6 #2

Exhibit B

Fees Apply
6 #1

Exhibit A

Fees Apply
#11

(#11) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to ex...

Fees Apply
#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by PETER K. BARBER on behalf of W...

Fees Apply
#7

(#7) Letter regarding counsel not being admitted to practice...

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by SAM'S...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WIN-HOLT EQUIPMENT CORP has been DENIED. This request has been forwarded to Chambers for review. (jdb) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
  • 10/21/2019
  • (#11) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to WIN Holt Equipment Corp. Co. i/p/a Win-Holt Equipment Corp... (BARBER, PETER) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
  • 10/21/2019
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by PETER K. BARBER on behalf of WIN-HOLT EQUIPMENT CORP (BARBER, PETER) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
  • 10/03/2019
  • (#9) TEXT ORDER- The Initial Conference scheduled for 10/9/2019 is hereby ADJOURNED to a date to be determined. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/3/2019. (kas) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
  • 10/02/2019
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file a motion for remand "until such time as [Plaintiff's counsel is] admitted in Federal Court." (ECF No. #7 .) The Court grants Plaintiff's request for an extension to file a motion to remand. The Court, however, will not grant an extension of indefinite duration. Plaintiff must file a motion to remand by November 4, 2019. The Court administratively terminates Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF No. #6 ) pending its consideration of Plaintiff's motion to remand. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/2/2019. (gxh) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
  • 09/30/2019
  • (#7) Letter regarding counsel not being admitted to practice in Federal Court from IAN GOLDMAN. (jdb) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
  • 09/13/2019
  • Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
  • 09/13/2019
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by SAM'S WEST, INC. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
  • 08/27/2019
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SAM'S WEST, INC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/13/2019. (km) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
  • 08/27/2019
  • (#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
  • 08/27/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #4 Application for an Extension of Time Pursuant to Rule 6.1 filed by Christina Matteo on 8/27/2019 was submitted incorrectly as an Application/Petition. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Request for a Clerk's Extension of Time under Rule 6.1 USING Civil Events- Other Filings - Other Documents - Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (km) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
  • 08/27/2019
  • (#4) APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time to Answer for by SAM'S WEST, INC. (MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#3) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/26/2019. (km) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
  • 08/23/2019
  • Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAM'S WEST, INC D/B/A SAM'S CLUB identifying Walmart Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SAM'S WEST, INC D/B/A SAM'S CLUB from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY OCEAN COUNTY, case number OCN L 001632 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9914718), filed by SAM'S WEST, INC D/B/A SAM'S CLUB.(MATTEO, CHRISTINA) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.