This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 05:52:39 (UTC).

Gissendanner v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Gissendanner filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Sanofi US Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14025

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erica Gissendanner

Defendants

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.

Sandoz, Inc.

Hospira, Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Accord Healthcare, Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Sun Pharma Global FZE

Hospira Worldwide, LLC

Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.

Hospira Worldwide, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randi Kassan

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman (New York)

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Karen Barth Menzies

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group LLP

6701 Center Drive West, 14Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Eric H Gibbs

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group LLP

505 14Th Street, Suite 1110

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc. (ss) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Kassan, Randi) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#4

(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

3 #7

Summons

3 #6

Summons

3 #5

Summons

3 #4

Summons

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(ss) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8006599) filed by Erica Gissendanner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)Attorney Randi Kassan added to party Erica Gissendanner(pty:pla).(Kassan, Randi) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc. (ss) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Kassan, Randi) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(ss) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8006599) filed by Erica Gissendanner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)Attorney Randi Kassan added to party Erica Gissendanner(pty:pla).(Kassan, Randi) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less