This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2022 at 09:13:40 (UTC).

Giscombe v. FDIC et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 Giscombe filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FDIC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy W. Berger and Embry J. Kidd. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01963

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy W. Berger

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M. A. Giscombe

Kissimmee, FL 34746

Defendants

FDIC

Capital One

UHaul

CareCredit

Credit One Bank

Comenity Bank

FDIC National Center for Consumer and Depositor Assistance

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) MOTION for Restraining Order and Order of Protection (construed) by M. A. Giscombe. (KNC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Hearing by M. A. Giscombe. (LDJ) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Hearing by M. A. Giscombe. (LDJ) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/26/2022. (RMF) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Restraining Order and Order of Protection (construed) by M. A. Giscombe. (KNC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by M. A. Giscombe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KNC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by M. A. Giscombe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNC) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less