This case was last updated from PACER on 01/30/2021 at 11:30:25 (UTC).

Girven v. First Unum Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 Girven filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against First Unum Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John J. O'Sullivan and Marcia G. Cooke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-24917

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John J. O'Sullivan

Presiding Judge

Marcia G. Cooke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deidre Girven

Defendant

First Unum Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Philip Dabdoub

Attorney at Dabdoub Law Firm, PA.

1600 Ponce De Leon Blvd, Suite 1202

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Bryn Elizabeth Natland

Attorney at Dabdoub Law Firm

1600 Ponce De Leon Blvd, Suite 1205

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorney

Kristina Beth Pett

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

2385 N.W. Executive Center Drive, Suite 400

Boca Raton, FL 33431

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Joint Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge for Final Disposition of Motions. Filed by Deidre Girven (Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

7 #2

Proposed Order

7 #1

A - Pretrial Deadlines, Pretrial Conference and Trial Date

#7

(#7) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Deidre Girven (Attachments: #1 A - Pretrial Deadlines, Pretrial Conference and Trial Date, #2 Proposed Order)(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristina Beth Pett on behalf of First Unum Life Insurance Company. Attorney Kristina Beth Pett added to party First Unum Life Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Pett, Kristina) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deidre Girven. First Unum Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. (Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for all non-dispositive pretrial matters, as well as motions for attorneys fees and costs and motions for sanctions, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to First Unum Life Insurance Company. (mee) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against First Unum Life Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13959031, filed by Deidre Girven. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge for Final Disposition of Motions. Filed by Deidre Girven (Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Deidre Girven (Attachments: #1 A - Pretrial Deadlines, Pretrial Conference and Trial Date, #2 Proposed Order)(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristina Beth Pett on behalf of First Unum Life Insurance Company. Attorney Kristina Beth Pett added to party First Unum Life Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Pett, Kristina) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deidre Girven. First Unum Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. (Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for all non-dispositive pretrial matters, as well as motions for attorneys fees and costs and motions for sanctions, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to First Unum Life Insurance Company. (mee) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against First Unum Life Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13959031, filed by Deidre Girven. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First UNUM Life Insurance Company is a litigant