This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 14:36:47 (UTC).

Giraud v. Cuevas

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Giraud filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Cuevas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stefan R. Underhill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00906

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stefan R. Underhill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rasheen Giraud

Uncasville, CT 06382

Defendant

Cuevas

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Docket Entry Correction re #5 Standing Scheduling Order ENTERED IN ERROR (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#9

(#9) Docket Entry Correction re #4 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals ENTERED IN ERROR. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 07/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#7

(#7) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#5

(#5) ENTERED IN ERROR - STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 7/7/2020 (Fazekas, J.). (Entered: 07/07/2020)

4 #1

Consent Form

#4

(#4) ENTERED IN ERROR - STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 7/7/2020 (Fazekas, J.). (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rasheen Giraud. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#1

(#1) PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Cuevas, filed by Rasheen Giraud.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 7/9/20. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Entry Correction re #5 Standing Scheduling Order ENTERED IN ERROR (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Entry Correction re #4 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals ENTERED IN ERROR. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 07/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTERED IN ERROR - STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 7/7/2020 (Fazekas, J.). (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTERED IN ERROR - STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 7/7/2020 (Fazekas, J.). (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Rasheen Giraud. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rasheen Giraud. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Cuevas, filed by Rasheen Giraud.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less