This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2023 at 09:01:51 (UTC).

Girard et al v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 Girard filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan A. Lenard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-23903

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan A. Lenard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Helene Girard

Roland Paquin

Nadeau Tremblay Inc. doing business as BOAT- MAX

Defendants

United States of America

Department of State

U.S. Secretary of State

National Visa Center

U.S. Consulate General Montreal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ronen Sarraf

Mark Andrew Prada

Defendant Attorney

Noticing INS Attorney

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Department of State, National Visa Center, U.S. Consulate General Montreal(Ana Escrogima, Consul General, in an official capacity), U.S. Consulate General Montreal, U.S. Secretary of State, United States of America.(ls) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Helene Girard, Nadeau Tremblay Inc., Roland Paquin re #1 Complaint, filed by Nadeau Tremblay Inc., Roland Paquin, Helene Girard (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s)) (Prada, Mark) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Ronen Sarraf, mailing date December 1, 2022, (pt) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Docket(#5) Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (aao) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Docket(#4) Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Multiple parties cannot be listed on a single summons. One summons is required for each party. Filer may file a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) with the corrected summons attached. (aao) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Docket(#3) Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (aao) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (aao) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Anthony Blinken, Department of State, Ana Escrogima, National Visa Center, U.S. Consulate General Montreal, United States of America. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16135614, filed by Nadeau Tremblay Inc., Roland Paquin, Helene Girard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Prada, Mark) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less