This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2021 at 09:44:09 (UTC).

G.I.P. SRL v. Urban Commons, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 G I P SRL filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Urban Commons, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Paul Oetken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08023

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Paul Oetken

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

G.I.P. SRL d/b/a Gruppo Italiano Progetti Srl

G.I.P. SRL doing business as Gruppo Italiano Progetti Srl

Defendants

Urban Commons, LLC

Eagle Nashville Airport Hotel, LLC

Taylor Woods

Howard Wu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Raymond Perkins

Attorney at Nicolette & Perkins, P.A.

3 University Plaza, Suite 503

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit agreement membership

1 #2

Exhibit put option agreement

1 #3

Exhibit urban common board advisors

1 #4

Exhibit wire transfer

1 #5

Exhibit escercizio opzione urban common

1 #6

Exhibit uc demand before lawsuit

1 #7

Exhibit deamnd ltr to eagle nashville

1 #8

Exhibit order for relief

1 #9

Exhibit order granting relief from stay mtn

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • Docket(#19) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Taylor Woods served on 10/30/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. Service was accepted by Tamara Woods, Spouse. Document filed by G.I.P. SRL..(Perkins, Eric) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Docket(#18) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Howard Wu served on 10/9/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. Service was accepted by Colleen Hamboing, Co-Resident. Document filed by G.I.P. SRL..(Perkins, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Docket(#17) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Eagle Nashville Airport Hotel, LLC served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. Service was accepted by "Jane Doe", Agent. Document filed by G.I.P. SRL..(Perkins, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Docket(#16) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Urban Commons, LLC served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. Service was accepted by Patrick Duffy, Agent. Document filed by G.I.P. SRL..(Perkins, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eagle Nashville Airport Hotel, LLC. (sj) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eagle Nashville Airport Hotel, LLC, re: #12 Complaint,,. Document filed by G.I.P. SRL..(Perkins, Eric) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docket(#13) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Perkins, Eric) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docket(#12) COMPLAINT against Eagle Nashville Airport Hotel, LLC, Urban Commons, LLC, Taylor Woods, Howard Wu. Document filed by G.I.P. SRL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit agreement membership, #2 Exhibit put option agreement, #3 Exhibit urban common board advisors, #4 Exhibit wire transfer, #5 Exhibit escercizio opzione urban common, #6 Exhibit uc demand before lawsuit, #7 Exhibit demand ltr to eagle nashville, #8 Exhibit order for relief, #9 Exhibit order granting relief from stay mtn).(Perkins, Eric) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#11) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Urban Commons, LLC..(jgo) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Taylor Woods..(jgo) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Eric Raymond Perkins to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#8) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by G.I.P. SRL d/b/a Gruppo Italiano Progetti Srl..(Perkins, Eric) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney Eric Raymond Perkins to RE-FILE Document #7 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. THE PDF IS NOT SIGNED (lb) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by G.I.P. SRL d/b/a Gruppo Italiano Progetti Srl..(Perkins, Eric) Modified on 9/28/2021 (lb). (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Howard Wu, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by G.I.P. SRL d/b/a Gruppo Italiano Progetti Srl..(Perkins, Eric) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Taylor Woods, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by G.I.P. SRL d/b/a Gruppo Italiano Progetti Srl..(Perkins, Eric) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nashville Airport Hotel, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by G.I.P. SRL d/b/a Gruppo Italiano Progetti Srl..(Perkins, Eric) Modified on 9/28/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Urban Commons LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by G.I.P. SRL d/b/a Gruppo Italiano Progetti Srl..(Perkins, Eric) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Perkins, Eric) Modified on 9/28/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25116210)Document filed by G.I.P. SRL d/b/a Gruppo Italiano Progetti Srl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit agreement membership, #2 Exhibit put option agreement, #3 Exhibit urban common board advisors, #4 Exhibit wire transfer, #5 Exhibit escercizio opzione urban common, #6 Exhibit uc demand before lawsuit, #7 Exhibit deamnd ltr to eagle nashville, #8 Exhibit order for relief, #9 Exhibit order granting relief from stay mtn).(Perkins, Eric) Modified on 9/28/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where URBAN COMMONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERIC R. PERKINS(Designation Retained)