This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/14/2020 at 08:50:22 (UTC).

Giordano et al v. Saks Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Giordano filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Saks Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Orenstein and Margo K. Brodie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00833

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James Orenstein

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ying-Liang Wang

Susan Giordano

Angelene Hayes

Defendants

Louis Vuitton USA Inc.

Prada USA Corp.

Brunello Cucinelli USA, Inc.

Saks Incorporated

Saks & Company LLC

Gucci America, Inc.

Fendi North America, Inc.

Loro Piana & C. Inc.

Saks Fifth Avenue LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Innessa Melamed Huot

Attorney at Faruqi & Faruqi LLP

685 Third Avenue, 26Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Alex J. Hartzband

Attorney at Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

685 Third Avenue, Ste 26Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Steven N. Williams

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm

601 California Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94108

Kevin Rayhill

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.

601 California St, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94108

Joseph R. Saveri

555 Montgomery Street, Suite 1210

San Francisco, CA 94111

Patrick Joseph Collopy

Attorney at Faruqi & Faruqi LLP

685 Third Avenue, 26Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Maile Solis

Attorney at Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg

200 W. Madison, Ste 3900

Chicago, IL 60606

Kevin Benjamin Goldstein

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

1700 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Eva W. Cole

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Robert E. Shapiro

Attorney at Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg

200 W. Madison Street, Suite 3900

Chicago, IL 60606

Owen Smith

Attorney at Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg

200 West Madison Street, Ste 3900

Chicago, IL 60606

Eric Shaun Hochstadt

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153-0119

David J. Lender

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Oluwaremilekun Ojurongbe

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2001 K Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Corey Roush

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2001 K Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Nathan J. Oleson

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2001 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#38

#37

#36

#35

34 #1

Receipt of Payment

#34

#33

#32

#27

1 #12

Proposed Summons

1 #11

Proposed Summons

1 #10

Proposed Summons

1 #9

Proposed Summons

1 #8

Proposed Summons

1 #7

Proposed Summons

1 #6

Proposed Summons

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Application #37 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Ordered by Clerk of Court on 3/27/2020. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Fendi North America, Inc., Loro Piana & C. Inc., Louis Vuitton USA Inc.. (Shapiro, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gucci America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kering Americas, Inc., Corporate Parent Kering Holland NV, Corporate Parent Kering SA for Gucci America, Inc.. (Roush, Corey) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Shapiro on behalf of Fendi North America, Inc., Loro Piana & C. Inc., Louis Vuitton USA Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Shapiro, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Robert E. Shapiro, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By April 2, 2020, Mr. Shapiro shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Shapiro shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Shapiro shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/26/2020. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert E. Shapiro, Esq; $150,Receipt # ANYEDC-12583151 by Fendi North America, Inc., Loro Piana & C. Inc., Louis Vuitton USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Receipt of Payment) (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Oluwaremilekun Ojurongbe on behalf of Gucci America, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Ojurongbe, Oluwaremilekun) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Oluwaremilekun Ojurongbe, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By March 31, 2020, Mr. Ojurongbe shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Ojurongbe shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Ojurongbe shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/24/2020. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J. Oleson on behalf of Gucci America, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Oleson, Nathan) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Corey Roush on behalf of Gucci America, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Roush, Corey) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ying-Liang Wang, Angelene Hayes, Susan Giordano. Gucci America, Inc. served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Huot, Innessa) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ying-Liang Wang, Angelene Hayes, Susan Giordano. Saks & Company LLC waiver sent on 2/18/2020, answer due 4/20/2020; Saks Fifth Avenue LLC waiver sent on 2/18/2020, answer due 4/20/2020; Saks Incorporated waiver sent on 2/18/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (Huot, Innessa) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ying-Liang Wang, Angelene Hayes, Susan Giordano. Fendi North America, Inc. served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020; Loro Piana & C. Inc. served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020; Louis Vuitton USA Inc. served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020; Prada USA Corp. served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (Huot, Innessa) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Joseph Collopy on behalf of Susan Giordano, Angelene Hayes, Ying-Liang Wang (aty to be noticed) (Collopy, Patrick) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alex J. Hartzband on behalf of Susan Giordano, Angelene Hayes, Ying-Liang Wang (aty to be noticed) (Hartzband, Alex) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Brunello Cucinelli USA, Inc., Fendi North America, Inc., Gucci America, Inc., Loro Piana & C. Inc., Louis Vuitton USA Inc., Prada USA Corp., Saks & Company LLC, Saks Fifth Avenue LLC, Saks Incorporated filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12397619 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Ying-Liang Wang, Angelene Hayes, Susan Giordano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons) (Huot, Innessa) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brunello Cuccinelli, USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Loro Piana & C. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LOUIS VUITTON USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PRADA USA INC. DBA MIU MIU is a litigant