This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2022 at 08:06:59 (UTC).

GIONET v. PELOSI et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 GIONET filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PELOSI. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Carl J. Nichols. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00610

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl J. Nichols

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mrs. Susanne Gionet

Phoenix, AZ 85023

SUSANNE GIONET

Not Classified By Court and Defendants

SUSAN E. LOFGREN

Washington, DC 20515

NANCY PATRICIA PELOSI

219 Cannon House Office Building, DC 20515

Hon. BENNIE G. THOMPSON

219 Cannon House Office Building, DC 20515

ADAM SCHIFF

Washington, DC 20515

ADAM D. KINZINGER

Washington, DC 20515

ELAINE G. LURIA

Washington, DC 20515

ELIZABETH L. CHENEY

Washington, DC 20515

JAMIE B. RASKIN

Washington, DC 20515

JOHN WOOD

Washington, DC 20515

PETER R. AGUILAR

Washington, DC 20515

STEPHANIE MURPHY

Washington, DC 20515

SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL

Washington, DC 20515

TIMOTHY J. HEAPHY

Washington, DC 20515

VERIZON AMERICAS LLC

1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

CELLCO PARTNERSHIP

BENNIE G. THOMPSON

VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

CELLCO PARTNERSHIP doing business as VERIZON WIRELESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Juli Zsuzsa Haller

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JULIA HALLER

601 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 8, 2022. (lccjn3) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

6 #1

Notice and Consent

6 #6

Main Document

5 #3

Text of Proposed Order

5 #2

Declaration

5 #1

Corrected Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission

5 #5

Main Document

4 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

4 #4

Main Document

2 #2

Declaration

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

2 #2

Main Document

1 #21

Summons

1 #20

Summons

1 #19

Summons

1 #18

Summons

1 #15

Summons

1 #9

Summons

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 8, 2022. (lccjn3) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (15) Issued Electronically as to PETER R. AGUILAR, CELLCO PARTNERSHIP, ELIZABETH L. CHENEY, TIMOTHY J. HEAPHY, ADAM D. KINZINGER, SUSAN E. LOFGREN, ELAINE G. LURIA, STEPHANIE MURPHY, NANCY PATRICIA PELOSI, JAMIE B. RASKIN, ADAM SCHIFF, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., JOHN WOOD. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ERRATA to correct by SUSANNE GIONET re #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Zachary John Thornley, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9083857. Fee Status: Fee Paid. filed by SUSANNE GIONET. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Haller, Juli) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ERRATA with Correction Complaint and Case Information Form by SUSANNE GIONET re #1 Complaint,, filed by SUSANNE GIONET. (Attachments: #1 Complaint correction, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haller, Juli) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to hallerjulia@outlook.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. File the signed complaint & civil cover sheet using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer, 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SUSANNE GIONET. (zsb) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Zachary John Thornley, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9083857. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Susanne Gionet. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Haller, Juli) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9083841) filed by Susanne Gionet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Related Case Form, #3 Related Case Form, #4 Related Case Form, #5 Related Case Form, #6 Related Case Form, #7 Related Case Form, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons)(Haller, Juli) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Communications Inc. is a litigant