This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:27:49 (UTC).

Gioioso v. NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Gioioso filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against NCL BAHAMAS LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Federico A. Moreno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-20662

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Federico A. Moreno

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carmela Gioioso

Defendant

NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Judd Gordon Rosen

Attorney at Goldberg & Rosen PA

1111 Brickell Avenue, Suite 2180

Miami, FL 33131

Kathleen M. Ortega

Attorney at Goldberg & Rosen, P.A.

1111 Brickell Ave, Suite 2180

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Geoffrey Edward Probst

Attorney at Norwegian Cruise Lines Inc.

7665 Corporate Center Drive

Miami, FL 33126

Todd L Sussman

Attorney at Norwegian Cruise Line

7300 Corporate Center Drive

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11409135, filed by Carmela Gioioso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Summon(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ortega, Kathleen) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#5

(#5) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint filed by Carmela Gioioso. Replies due by 4/8/2019. (Ortega, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD. (kpe) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#6

(#6) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint filed by NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD. Attorney Todd L Sussman added to party NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD(pty:dft). (Sussman, Todd) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

1 #2

Summon(s)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD. Attorney Geoffrey Edward Probst added to party NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/2/2019 (Probst, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint filed by NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD. Attorney Todd L Sussman added to party NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD(pty:dft). (Sussman, Todd) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint filed by Carmela Gioioso. Replies due by 4/8/2019. (Ortega, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD. Attorney Geoffrey Edward Probst added to party NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/2/2019 (Probst, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD. (kpe) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11409135, filed by Carmela Gioioso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Summon(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ortega, Kathleen) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.