This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2021 at 08:52:44 (UTC).

Ginsberg v. CC Vending, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 Ginsberg filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CC Vending, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Naomi Reice Buchwald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-09742

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Naomi Reice Buchwald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Ginsberg

Defendants

CC Vending, Inc.

Heartland Payment Systems, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vivek Jayaram

Attorney at Jayaram Law Group

125 S Clark St, Ste 1175

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie L Denker

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americas, Suite 2005

New York, NY 10020

Ryan Lawrence Diclemente

Attorney at Saul Ewing LLP

650 College Road East

Princeton, NJ 08540

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER terminating #7 Letter Motion for Conference ; granting #10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Application granted. The conference is adjourned until January 19, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. (Telephone Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/7/2021) (jwh) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#10

(#10) LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (pre-motion conference) addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Ryan L. DiClemente, Esq. dated 01-07-2021. Document filed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC..(Diclemente, Ryan) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER: The Court has reviewed defendant Heartland Payment System LLC's letter dated December 16, 2020 regarding a pre-motion conference in anticipation of motion to dismiss plaintiff's amended complaint and plaintiff's letter dated December 30, 2020 in response. A telephonic conference concerning the contemplated motion is hereby set for January 13, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. The Court will post the dial-in information to the docket in advance of the conference.SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 1/13/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/04/2021) (ama) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#8

(#8) LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Vivek Jayaram dated December 30, 2020 re: Response to Defendant's letter requesting a pre-motion conference. Document filed by Matthew Ginsberg..(Jayaram, Vivek) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#7

(#7) LETTER MOTION for Conference (pre-motion conference) addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Ryan L. DiClemente, Esq. dated 12-16-2020. Document filed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC..(Diclemente, Ryan) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: SO ORDERED. (Heartland Payment Systems, LLC answer due 12/18/2020.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/20/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vivek Jayaram on behalf of Matthew Ginsberg..(Jayaram, Vivek) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#4

(#4) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Ryan DiClemente dated November 20, 2020. Document filed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC..(Denker, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie L Denker on behalf of Heartland Payment Systems, LLC..(Denker, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Diclemente, Ryan) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 655614/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22659707).Document filed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3).(Diclemente, Ryan) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER terminating #7 Letter Motion for Conference ; granting #10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Application granted. The conference is adjourned until January 19, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. (Telephone Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/7/2021) (jwh) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (pre-motion conference) addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Ryan L. DiClemente, Esq. dated 01-07-2021. Document filed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC..(Diclemente, Ryan) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: The Court has reviewed defendant Heartland Payment System LLC's letter dated December 16, 2020 regarding a pre-motion conference in anticipation of motion to dismiss plaintiff's amended complaint and plaintiff's letter dated December 30, 2020 in response. A telephonic conference concerning the contemplated motion is hereby set for January 13, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. The Court will post the dial-in information to the docket in advance of the conference.SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 1/13/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/04/2021) (ama) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Vivek Jayaram dated December 30, 2020 re: Response to Defendant's letter requesting a pre-motion conference. Document filed by Matthew Ginsberg..(Jayaram, Vivek) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER MOTION for Conference (pre-motion conference) addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Ryan L. DiClemente, Esq. dated 12-16-2020. Document filed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC..(Diclemente, Ryan) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: SO ORDERED. (Heartland Payment Systems, LLC answer due 12/18/2020.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/20/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vivek Jayaram on behalf of Matthew Ginsberg..(Jayaram, Vivek) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Ryan DiClemente dated November 20, 2020. Document filed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC..(Denker, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ryan Lawrence Diclemente. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Heartland Payment Systems, LLC, CC Vending, Inc., Matthew Ginsberg. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie L Denker on behalf of Heartland Payment Systems, LLC..(Denker, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Diclemente, Ryan) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 655614/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22659707).Document filed by Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3).(Diclemente, Ryan) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heartland Payment Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vivek Jayaram