Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2021 at 11:16:00 (UTC).

Ginegar LLC v. Slack Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On February 19, 2021, Ginegar LLC (“Ginegar”), represented by Jon Bentley Hyland of Hilgers Graben PLLC-Dallas, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Slack Technologies, Inc. (the “Defendant”) seeking damages with prejudgment interest for allegedly infringing one or more claims of two patents owned by Ginegar. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the District of Colorado with Judge Scott T. Varholak presiding.

 

Ginegar, in its complaint, alleged that the Defendant had allegedly infringed its U.S. Patent Numbers 9,367,521 (the “’521 Patent”) entitled “Content and Context Based Handling of Instant Messages”, that claims, among other things, a method of processing instant messages, and 9,760,865 (the “’865 Patent”), entitled “Multi-Modal Transcript Unification in a Collaborative Environment'', which provides systems and methods that allow users to converse with each other using multi-modal communication and that automatically log a chat transcript that contained multi-modal communication, such as text and audio in one chat session, collectively referred to as “the Patents-in-Suit.”

 

Ginegar alleged that “in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(a), Slack Technologies has directly infringed the ’521 Patent, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, by making, using, selling, and/or offering to sell in the United States, and/or importing into the United States, without license or authority, Slack.” and that “in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 371(b), Slack Technologies has also indirectly infringed the ’521 Patent by actively inducing infringement of the’521 Patent by users of Slack, knowing that their use of Slack would and has directly infringed, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, the ’521 Patent.

 

Ginegar also alleged that “in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 371(c), Slack Technologies has also indirectly infringed the ’521 Patent by offering to sell or license and/or selling or licensing with the United States Slack for use in practicing one or more of the methods claimed in the ’521 Patent, knowing that use of Slack by users would directly infringe, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, the ’521 Patent.” Ginegar has made similar allegations for infringement of ‘865 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. §§ 271(a), 371(b) and 371 ©.

 

There are two claims for relief laid down by Ginegar, one for the alleged infringement of each of the Patents-in-Suit wherein Ginegar alleged that Slack Technologies has had notice of the Patents in Suit at least as of the date of service of this Complaint and that as a result of Defendant's alleged infringement of the Patents-in-Suit, Ginegar has suffered and continues to suffer substantial injury and is entitled to recover all damages as claimed hereunder.

 

In its prayer for relief, Ginegar requested the court to enter a judgement for Ginegar on all causes of actions asserted in the Complaint and to award monetary damages to compensate it for Defendant's alleged infringement of the Patents-in-Suit pursuant to 35 U.S.C.§ 284, including costs and prejudgment interest as allowed by law, in addition to accounting and/or supplemental damages for all damages occurring after any discovery cutoff and through the Court’s entry of final judgment and costs of litigation.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00494

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ginegar LLC

Defendant

Slack Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jon Bentley Hyland

Attorney at Hilgers Graben PLLC-Dallas

10000 N. Central Expressway, Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorney

Christine L. Ranney

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP-Denver

1801 California Street, Suite 4200

Denver, CO 80202-2642

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Slack Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ranney, Christine) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ginegar LLC. Slack Technologies, Inc. served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/29/2021 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 4/15/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/22/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/22/2021. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Slack Technologies, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7727059)Attorney Jon Bentley Hyland added to party Ginegar LLC(pty:pla), filed by Ginegar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

13 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Motion for 45-Day Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the operative complaint is extended until 4/29/2021. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2021 09:15 AM is VACATED and RESET for 5/25/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak.The parties shall participate in the conference by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The parties shall file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form on or before 5/11/2021, and shall submit a joint Proposed Scheduling Order on or before 5/18/2021. The parties shall comply with the requirements of D.C.COLO.LPtR 3(c) with regard to the submission of a proposed protective order on or before 5/13/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/09/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Slack Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ranney, Christine) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ginegar LLC. Slack Technologies, Inc. served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/29/2021 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 4/15/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/22/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/22/2021. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (alave, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent KMizra, LLC for Ginegar LLC. (Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Slack Techologies, Inc. re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Ginegar LLC. (Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Slack Technologies, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7727059)Attorney Jon Bentley Hyland added to party Ginegar LLC(pty:pla), filed by Ginegar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Slack Technologies, Inc. is a litigant