Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2020 at 14:36:11 (UTC).

Gilstrap v. CBS Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 Gilstrap filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CBS Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sherry R. Fallon and Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00309

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sherry R. Fallon

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Jerry S. Gilstrap

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Electric Boat Corporation

Goulds Pumps LLC

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Parker-Hannifin Corporation

Crane Co.

CBS Corporation

Does 1-450 Inclusive

General Dynamics Corporation

IMO Industries, Inc.

Electric Boat Corporation d/b/a General Dynamics Electric Boat sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Electric Boat Company, a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of Connecticut

Jerry S. Gilstrap

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Ian Connor Bifferato

Attorney at The Bifferato Firm, P.A.

1007 N. Orange Street, 4Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Erik C. DiMarco

Michael J. Ramirez

Michael C. Heyden, Jr.

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

1201 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kelly A. Costello

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1007 Orange Street, Suite 501

Wilmington, DE 19801

Ana Marina McCann

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin

1007 N. Orange Street, Suite 600, P.O. Box 8888

Wilmington, DE 19899-8888

Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin

1007 N. Orange Street, Suite 600, P.O. Box 8888

Wilmington, DE 19899-8888

Jessica Lee Tyler

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin

1007 N. Orange Street, Suite 600, P.O. Box 8888

Wilmington, DE 19899-8888

Nicholas E. Skiles

Attorney at Swartz Campbell LLC

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410, P.O. Box 330

Wilmington, DE 19801

Francis C. Gondek

Attorney at Swartz Campbell LLC

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410, P.O. Box 330

Wilmington, DE 19801

Beth E. Valocchi

Attorney at Swartz Campbell LLC

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410, P.O. Box 330

Wilmington, DE 19801

Allison L. Texter

Attorney at Swartz Campbell LLC

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410, P.O. Box 330

Wilmington, DE 19801

Eileen M. Ford

Attorney at Marks, O'Neill, O'Brien, Doherty & Kelly, P.C.

300 Delaware Ave., Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Megan Trocki Mantzavinos

Attorney at Marks, O'Neill, O'Brien, Doherty & Kelly, P.C.

300 Delaware Ave., Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Ian Connor Bifferato

Attorney at The Bifferato Firm, P.A.

1007 N. Orange Street, 4Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production and Request for Admission to Defendants filed by Jerry S. Gilstrap.(Bifferato, Ian) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#31

(#31) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by CBS Corporation.(Texter, Allison) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#30

(#30) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant IMO Industries Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure filed by IMO Industries, Inc.(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Delaval Steam Turbine Company and Delaval, Inc., a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of North Carolina).(Ford, Eileen) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC publicly held companies holding 10% or more of Ingersoll Rand Company's stock for Ingersoll-Rand Company filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Tyler, Jessica) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lee Tyler on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (Tyler, Jessica) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry S. Gilstrap. CBS Corporation served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019; Crane Co. served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019; Electric Boat Corporation served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019; General Dynamics Corporation served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019; Goulds Pumps LLC served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019; IMO Industries, Inc. served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019; Ingersoll-Rand Company served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019; Parker-Hannifin Corporation served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Bifferato, Ian) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 2/27/2019 (lih). (Entered: 02/27/2019)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production and Request for Admission to Defendants filed by Jerry S. Gilstrap.(Bifferato, Ian) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Shipyard Defendant filed by Jerry S. Gilstrap.(Bifferato, Ian) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Response Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Jerry S. Gilstrap.(Bifferato, Ian) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Crane Co..(Skiles, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by CBS Corporation.(Texter, Allison) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant IMO Industries Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure filed by IMO Industries, Inc.(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Delaval Steam Turbine Company and Delaval, Inc., a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of North Carolina).(Ford, Eileen) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 5/14/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/14/2019. Discovery due by 3/9/2020. A Status Conference is set for 4/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon by telephone. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the telephone call. Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2020. (See Scheduling Order for Additional Deadlines). Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/4/2019. (nmg) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Scheduling Teleconference held on 4/1/2019. (Court Reporter S. Ingram (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE of Appearance by Allison L. Texter on behalf of CBS Corporation (Texter, Allison) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC publicly held companies holding 10% or more of Ingersoll Rand Company's stock for Ingersoll-Rand Company filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Tyler, Jessica) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 2/27/2019 (lih). (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lee Tyler on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Tyler, Jessica) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lee Tyler on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (Tyler, Jessica) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (bkb) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry S. Gilstrap. CBS Corporation served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019; Crane Co. served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019; Electric Boat Corporation served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019; General Dynamics Corporation served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019; Goulds Pumps LLC served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019; IMO Industries, Inc. served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019; Ingersoll-Rand Company served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019; Parker-Hannifin Corporation served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Bifferato, Ian) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to CBS Corporation on 2/13/2019; Crane Co. on 2/13/2019; Electric Boat Corporation on 2/13/2019; General Dynamics Corporation on 2/13/2019; Goulds Pumps LLC on 2/13/2019; IMO Industries, Inc. on 2/13/2019; Ingersoll-Rand Company on 2/13/2019; Parker-Hannifin Corporation on 2/13/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Does 1-450 Inclusive, Electric Boat Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, Goulds Pumps LLC, IMO Industries, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Parker-Hannifin Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2569768.) - filed by Jerry S. Gilstrap. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAL DYNAMICS - OTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PARKER-HANNIFAN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CBS CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER WITH CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BF STURTEVANT is a litigant

Latest cases where Ingersoll Rand Co. is a litigant