This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2020 at 08:08:58 (UTC).

Gilpin v. Saint-Gobain Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 Gilpin filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Saint-Gobain Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-40129

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lori Gilpin

Defendants

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Saint-Gobain Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan P. Avery

Attorney at Mirageas & Avery

Suite 201, 300 East Main Street

Milford, MA 01757

Defendant Attorneys

James M. Hlawek

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw

World Trade Center East, Suite 300, Two Seaport Lane

Boston, MA 02210

Hannah M. Lindgren

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

1601 Cherry Street, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Francis J. Bingham

Attorney at Littler Mendelson P.C.

One International Place, Suite 2700

Boston, MA 02110

Sarah Bryan Fask

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

Three Parkway, 1601 Cherry Street, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102-1321

 

Court Documents

17 #2

Affidavit of Hannah M. Lindgren

17 #1

Affidavit of Sarah Bryan Fask

#17

#16

#15

#13

#11

#10

4 #9

Exhibit I

4 #8

Exhibit H

4 #7

Exhibit G

4 #6

Exhibit F

4 #5

Exhibit E

4 #4

Exhibit D

4 #3

Exhibit C

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sarah Bryan Fask and Hannah M. Lindgren. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sarah Bryan Fask, Hannah M. Lindgren Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-8541334 by Saint-Gobain Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sarah Bryan Fask, #2 Affidavit of Hannah M. Lindgren)(Bingham, Francis) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Saint-Gobain Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Societe de Participations Financieres et Industrielles, Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain for Saint-Gobain Corporation.. (Bingham, Francis) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, by Saint-Gobain Corporation.(Bingham, Francis) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer due 12/17/2020. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Second Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Hlawek, James) Modified on 12/2/2020 (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer due 12/3/2020. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Hlawek, James) Modified on 11/12/2020 (Castles, Martin). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Hlawek, James) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Hlawek on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Hlawek, James) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Saint-Gobain Corporation answer due 12/7/2020. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 7, 2020 to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint, by Saint-Gobain Corporation.(Bingham, Francis) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Avery, Ryan) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Saint-Gobain Corporation served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Avery, Ryan) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Saint-Gobain Corporation, filed by Lori Gilpin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Avery, Ryan) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Saint-Gobain Corporation Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8465165 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Lori Gilpin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(Avery, Ryan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/15/2020) (Burgos, Sandra). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/15/2020) (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Saint-Gobain Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where The Prudential Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan P. Avery