This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:36:31 (UTC).

Gilot v. Act Blue

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Gilot filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Act Blue. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen McMahon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11256

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen McMahon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Farrah Gilot

Brooklyn, NY 11210

Defendant

Act Blue

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CIVIL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), and for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/16/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiff's complaint, filed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1), is dismissed as frivolous, 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), and for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/16/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/17/2019) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Farrah Gilot consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Farrah Gilot.(rdz) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Act Blue. Document filed by Farrah Gilot.(rdz) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Farrah Gilot.(rdz) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #6 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), Notice of Appeal Forms, to Farrah Gilot 1238 East 39th Street Brooklyn, NY 11210. (vba) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #5 Order of Dismissal, to Farrah Gilot 1238 East 39th Street Brooklyn, NY 11210. (vba) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), and for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/16/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiff's complaint, filed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1), is dismissed as frivolous, 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), and for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/16/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application to Farrah Gilot 1238 East 39th Street Brooklyn, NY 11210. (aea) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/17/2019) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Farrah Gilot consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Farrah Gilot.(rdz) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Act Blue. Document filed by Farrah Gilot.(rdz) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Farrah Gilot.(rdz) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.