This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/26/2020 at 11:14:53 (UTC).

Gilmore v. Quay

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Gilmore filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Quay. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew W. Brann, MA and EBC. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01291

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

Referral Judges

MA

EBC

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tyganda Gilmore

White Deer, PA 17887

Respondent

Mr. Quay

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Michael Butler

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

228 Walnut Street, Suite 220

Harrisburg, PA 17108

Joseph J Terz

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

228 Walnut St, Room 217, Federal Building

Harrisburg, PA 17108

 

Court Documents

13 #2

Unpublished Opinion(s)

13 #1

Exhibit(s)

#13

#12

11 #1

request for docket sheet, etc

#11

#10

#9

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

6 #1

Notice of Consent

#6

#5

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Mr. Quay by Mr. Quay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Butler, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER denying #11 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/31/2020. (jr) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Amend and add defendants/parties by Tyganda Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 request for docket sheet, etc) (NOTE: docket sheet sent)(lg) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for Habeas Corpus Served on US Attorney (mfa) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted; the petition is deemed filed; #5 Motion for injunctive relief is construed as a supplement to the petition; Clerk directed to terminate the motion; Clerk directed to serve the petition and supplement on Respondent and the US Attorney; Show Cause Response due by 9/14/2020. (See order for further/complete details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/24/2020. (lg) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re Tyganda Gilmore. (bg) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Assignment error. Case previously with Judge Brann/MA - Case now assigned to Judge Brann/EBC. (lp) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Petitioner is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Petitioner's trust fund account to this Court and to the Petitioner. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action. Signed by LP on 07/28/2020. (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION Grounds/Arguments Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Tyganda Gilmore.(lp) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Tyganda Gilmore. (lp) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISONER AUTHORIZATION by Tyganda Gilmore allowing prison to submit copy of prisoner's trust fund account to the court, and approving the entire filing fee to be deducted from prisoner inmate account.. (lp) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tyganda Gilmore.(lp) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Tyganda Gilmore.(lp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2020: #1 Exhibits) (lp). (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Butler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph J Terz