This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2021 at 09:14:10 (UTC).

Gilmore v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 Gilmore filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-08159

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Scott Gilmore

Julio Ezcurra

Sherry Hanna

Kristy Williams

Amanda Boyette

James Weeks

Anthony Jewell

Paul Taylor

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Interested Parties

Jason Rinehart

Brian Webb

Intervenors

Ryan Tomlinson

Carol Richardson

Gary Brown

Patricia Godsey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gillian L. Wade

Gillian Leigh Wade

Attorney at Milstein Jackson Fairchild & Wade, LLP

10990 Wilshire Boulevardsuite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90024

William J. Rhodunda, Jr.

Attorney at Rhodunda Williams & Kondraschow

1521 Concord Pike, Suite 205

Wilmington, DE 19803

Chandra Joan Williams

Attorney at Rhodunda Williams & Kondraschow

1521 Concord Pike, Suite 205

Wilmington, DE 19803

Marc A. Castaneda

Sara D. Avila

Defendant Attorneys

Jeff Wilkerson

John J. Rosenthal

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

1901 L St., Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Kelly E. Farnan

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Squaresuite 600

Wilmington, DE 19801

Interested Party Attorneys

Elizabeth A. Fegan

Attorney at Fegan Scott LLC

150 S. Wacker Dr., 24Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Sarah Michelle Ennis

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenuesuite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

John Warren Raggio

5473 Blair Rd

Dallas, TX 75231

Intervenor Attorneys

Patrick J. Stueve

Todd E. Hilton

Cortlan S. Hitch

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Cort A. VanOstran

Attorney at Gray Ritter & Graham PC

701 Market Street, Suite 800

St. Louis, MO 63101

Don M Downing

Attorney at Gray Ritter & Graham PC

701 Market Street, Suite 800

St. Louis, MO 63101

Gretchen Garrison

Attorney at Gray Ritter & Graham PC

701 Market Street, Suite 800

St. Louis, MO 63101

Gretchen A. Garrison

David W. DeBruin

Attorney at Jenner & Block

601 13Th Street, N.W.12Th Flr

Washington, DC 20005

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

78 #2

Proposed Order

78 #1

Exhibit 1

78 #78

Main Document

77 #2

Proposed Order

77 #1

Declaration of Todd Hilton

77 #77

Main Document

#76

(#76) NOTICE of Appearance by Don M Downing (Downing, Don) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#75

(#75) NOTICE of Appearance by Cort A. VanOstran (VanOstran, Cort) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#74

(#74) NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen Garrison (Garrison, Gretchen) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#73

(#73) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Eugene Hilton (Hilton, Todd) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

70 #70

Main Document

#7

#6

4 #1

Affidavit Certificates of Gillian L. Wade, Esq; Sara D. Avila, Esq and Marc A. C

#4

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

129 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) MOTION to Intervene filed by Carol Richardson, Ryan Tomlinson. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 12/28/2021. Replies due by 1/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Stueve, Patrick) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Carol Richardson, Ryan Tomlinson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Hilton, #2 Proposed Order)(Stueve, Patrick) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) NOTICE of Appearance by Don M Downing (Downing, Don) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) NOTICE of Appearance by Cort A. VanOstran (VanOstran, Cort) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen Garrison (Garrison, Gretchen) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Eugene Hilton (Hilton, Todd) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #70 Joint MOTION for Suggestion of Remand to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware ) filed byBrian Webb. (Raggio, John) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Joseph Stueve (Stueve, Patrick) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Joint MOTION for Suggestion of Remand to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware filed by Amanda Boyette, Julio Ezcurra, Scott Gilmore, Sherry Hanna, Anthony Jewell, Paul Taylor, James Weeks, Kristy Williams. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 12/14/2021. Replies due by 12/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wade, Gillian) (Filed on 11/30/2021) Modified on 12/1/2021 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) NOTICE by Amanda Boyette, Julio Ezcurra, Scott Gilmore, Sherry Hanna, Anthony Jewell, Paul Taylor, James Weeks, Kristy Williams re #67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Regarding Schedule For Briefing Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Proposed Class Action Settlement And Extension Of The Page Limit For Certain Briefs, #68 Joint MOTION To Set Schedule For Briefing On Preliminary Approval Of Proposed Class Action Settlement And Extend The Page Limit For Certain Briefs Notice Of Withdrawal Of Joint Administrative Motion To Set Schedule For Briefing On Preliminary Approval Of Proposed Class Action Settlement And Extend The Page Limit For Certain Briefs (Wade, Gillian) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John J. Rosenthal and Jeff Wilkerson - filed by Monsanto Company. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 19, 2020 - filed by Monsanto Company. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gillian L. Wade, Esq.; Sara D. Avila, Esq. and Marc A. Castaneda, Esq. filed by Scott Gilmore. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/27/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed by Scott Gilmore. Monsanto Company served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Williams, Chandra) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: Counsel improperly filed summons to be issued at D.I. 3. This docket entry has since been deleted. (kmd) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gillian L. Wade, Esq.; Sara D. Avila, Esq. and Marc A. Castaneda, Esq. - filed by Scott Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificates of Gillian L. Wade, Esq; Sara D. Avila, Esq and Marc A. Castaneda, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Williams, Chandra) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (myr) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Monsanto Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3140065.) - filed by Scott Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monsanto Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd E. Hilton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cortlan S. Hitch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gretchen Garrison