This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/04/2020 at 13:10:16 (UTC).

Gilmore v. Hunter et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 Gilmore filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Hunter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shon T. Erwin and Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00521

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shon T. Erwin

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Roy Gilmore

Canon City, CO 81215

Respondents

Mike Hunter

Oklahoma County District Court

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Katherine R Morelli

Attorney at Attorney General's Ofc-NE 21STREET-OKC

313 Ne 21St St

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

 

Court Documents

8 #5

Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet OSCN

8 #4

Exhibit 4 - Motion to Dismiss

8 #3

Exhibit 3 - Second Amended Motion

8 #2

Exhibit 2 - Motion for Speedy Trial

8 #1

Exhibit 1 - Information

#8

(#8) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Lack of Jurisdiction, Improper Venue and Lack of Exhaustion by Mike Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - Motion for Speedy Trial, #3 Exhibit 3 - Second Amended Motion, #4 Exhibit 4 - Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet OSCN)(Morelli, Katherine) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Lack of Jurisdiction, Improper Venue and Lack of Exhaustion by Mike Hunter. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Morelli, Katherine) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Katherine R Morelli on behalf of Mike Hunter (Morelli, Katherine) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER -- ORDER FOR RESPONSE BY UNITED STATES ATTORNEY TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BY A PERSON IN FEDERAL CUSTODY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2241. The Respondent shall file an answer responding to the allegations of the petition within thirty (30) days from this date. See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 6/12/2020. (mc) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#4

(#4) Receipt for Money Received from Roy Gilmore in the amount of $5.00, receipt number OKW500080310 regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Receipt mailed to Roy Gilmore #173125 CANON CITY-FCF Fremont Correctional Facility P.O. Box 999 Canon City, CO 81215. (ank) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#3

(#3) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 06/04/2020. (knt) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#2

(#2) NO PREVIOUS Cases (knt) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Roy Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at #http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Lack of Jurisdiction, Improper Venue and Lack of Exhaustion by Mike Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - Motion for Speedy Trial, #3 Exhibit 3 - Second Amended Motion, #4 Exhibit 4 - Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet OSCN)(Morelli, Katherine) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Lack of Jurisdiction, Improper Venue and Lack of Exhaustion by Mike Hunter. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Morelli, Katherine) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Katherine R Morelli on behalf of Mike Hunter (Morelli, Katherine) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER -- ORDER FOR RESPONSE BY UNITED STATES ATTORNEY TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BY A PERSON IN FEDERAL CUSTODY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2241. The Respondent shall file an answer responding to the allegations of the petition within thirty (30) days from this date. See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 6/12/2020. (mc) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Receipt for Money Received from Roy Gilmore in the amount of $5.00, receipt number OKW500080310 regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Receipt mailed to Roy Gilmore #173125 CANON CITY-FCF Fremont Correctional Facility P.O. Box 999 Canon City, CO 81215. (ank) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 06/04/2020. (knt) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NO PREVIOUS Cases (knt) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Roy Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oklahoma County District Attorney's Office is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine R Morelli