This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2020 at 07:32:09 (UTC).

Gillick et al v. Elliott et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 Gillick filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Elliott. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jean C. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03094

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jean C. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Gillick

Terry Briggs

Robert Bieg, Jr.

Michael Lutz

Bradley Grant

Corey Black

Defendants

Steve MacDonald

Matthew Andrews

Gary Elliott

Richard McLaughlin

Brandon Flinn

Don Willey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rex P. Fennessey

Attorney at MCMAHON BERGER PC

2730 N. Ballas Road, Suite 200

St. Louis, MO 63131-3039

Defendant Attorneys

James I. Singer

Attorney at SCHUCHAT COOK

1221 Locust Street, Second Floor

St. Louis, MO 63103-2364

Matthew B. Leppert

Attorney at SCHUCHAT COOK

1221 Locust Street, Second Floor

St. Louis, MO 63103-2364

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew B. Leppert for Defendants Matthew Andrews, Gary Elliott, Brandon Flinn, Steve MacDonald, Richard McLaughlin, Don Willey. (Leppert, Matthew) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Matthew Andrews, Gary Elliott, Brandon Flinn, Steve MacDonald, Richard McLaughlin, Don Willey. (Singer, James) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Matthew Andrews, Gary Elliott, Brandon Flinn, Steve MacDonald, Richard McLaughlin, Don Willey. (Singer, James) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Jean C. Hamilton for all further proceedings. (EAB) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Don Willey Don Willey waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Steve MacDonald Steve MacDonald waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Richard McLaughlin Richard McLaughlin waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Brandon Flinn Brandon Flinn waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Elliott Gary Elliott waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ENTRY of Appearance by James I. Singer for Defendants Matthew Andrews, Gary Elliott, Brandon Flinn, Steve MacDonald, Richard McLaughlin, Don Willey. (Singer, James) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: 6 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Rex P. Fennessey. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUPPLEMENTAL re #2 Notice of Process Server, #1 Complaint, Summons of Steve MacDonald by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz. (Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUPPLEMENTAL re #2 Notice of Process Server, #1 Complaint, Summons of Richard McLaughlin by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz. (Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUPPLEMENTAL re #2 Notice of Process Server, #1 Complaint, Summons of Matthew Andrews by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz. (Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUPPLEMENTAL re #2 Notice of Process Server, #1 Complaint, Summons of Gary Elliott by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz. (Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUPPLEMENTAL re #2 Notice of Process Server, #1 Complaint, Summons of Don Willey by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz. (Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUPPLEMENTAL re #2 Notice of Process Server, #1 Complaint, Summons for Brandon Flinn by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz. (Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz Process Server: Jack Eisen/Eisen Enterprises (Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7580134, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Michael Lutz, Robert Bieg, Jr., Bradley Grant, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Corey Black. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James I. Singer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew B. Leppert