This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2019 at 07:03:33 (UTC).

GILLIAM v. DAVIDSON MEDIA GROUP, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 GILLIAM filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against DAVIDSON MEDIA GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03029

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL M. BAYLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIFFANI GILLIAM

Defendants

MARC GURALNICK

LA MEGA PHILADELPHIA, LLC

DAVIDSON MEDIA GROUP, LLC

M.S. ACQUISITIONS & HOLDINGS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK S. SCHEFFER

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARK S. SCHEFFER

Pobox 111

Birchrunville, PA 19421

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL S. ZULLO

Attorney at DUANE MORRIS, LLP

30 South 17Th St.

Phila, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DAVIDSON MEDIA GROUP, LLC, MARC GURALNICK, LA MEGA PHILADELPHIA, LLC, M.S. ACQUISITIONS & HOLDINGS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200326.), filed by TIFFANI GILLIAM.(jwl, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#2

(#2) STIPULATION to extend time to respond to plaintiff's complaint by LA MEGA PHILADELPHIA, LLC, M.S. ACQUISITIONS & HOLDINGS. (ZULLO, MICHAEL)*FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 8/29/2019 (lisad, ). (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#3

(#3) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS LA MEGA PHILADELPHIA, LLC AND M.S. ACQUISITIONS & HOLDINGS TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED UNTIL 9/26/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/28/2019. 8/29/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS LA MEGA PHILADELPHIA, LLC AND M.S. ACQUISITIONS & HOLDINGS TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED UNTIL 9/26/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/28/2019. 8/29/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STIPULATION to extend time to respond to plaintiff's complaint by LA MEGA PHILADELPHIA, LLC, M.S. ACQUISITIONS & HOLDINGS. (ZULLO, MICHAEL)*FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 8/29/2019 (lisad, ). (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TIFFANI GILLIAM. (jwl, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Summons Issued as to DAVIDSON MEDIA GROUP, LLC, MARC GURALNICK, LA MEGA PHILADELPHIA, LLC, M.S. ACQUISITIONS & HOLDINGS. Four Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/12/19 (jwl, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against DAVIDSON MEDIA GROUP, LLC, MARC GURALNICK, LA MEGA PHILADELPHIA, LLC, M.S. ACQUISITIONS & HOLDINGS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200326.), filed by TIFFANI GILLIAM.(jwl, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.