This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 12:57:20 (UTC).

GILLHAM LLC v. KYRGYZ REPUBLIC

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 GILLHAM LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against KYRGYZ REPUBLIC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Berman Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01795

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Berman Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GILLHAM LLC

Defendant and Respondent

KYRGYZ REPUBLIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

James E. Berger

Attorney at KING & SPALDING LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

6 #1

FedEx Waybill

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons and complaint, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 8/13/2020, by FEDEX, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (Attachments: #1 FedEx Waybill) (ztd) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING re #1 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, #2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, #3 Summons Issued Electronically by GILLHAM LLC. (Berger, James) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to KYRGYZ REPUBLIC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GILLHAM LLC (Berger, James) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

1 #8

Exhibit D - Notice of Arbitration

1 #7

Exhibit C - Assignment Agreement

1 #6

Exhibit B - Kyrgyzstan Law on Investments

1 #5

Exhibit A - Award

1 #4

Declaration of Charlene C. Sun

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Notice of Filing Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitral Award

#1

(#1) PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD against KYRGYZ REPUBLIC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7292216) filed by GILLHAM LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitral Award, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration of Charlene C. Sun, #5 Exhibit A - Award, #6 Exhibit B - Kyrgyzstan Law on Investments, #7 Exhibit C - Assignment Agreement, #8 Exhibit D - Notice of Arbitration)(Berger, James) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons and complaint, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 8/13/2020, by FEDEX, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (Attachments: #1 FedEx Waybill) (ztd) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST from Plaintiff's for the Clerk to effect service of one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by FEDEX, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (ztd) Modified on 8/13/2020 (ztd). (SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #4 TO VIEW.) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING re #1 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, #2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, #3 Summons Issued Electronically by GILLHAM LLC. (Berger, James) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to KYRGYZ REPUBLIC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GILLHAM LLC (Berger, James) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD against KYRGYZ REPUBLIC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7292216) filed by GILLHAM LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitral Award, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration of Charlene C. Sun, #5 Exhibit A - Award, #6 Exhibit B - Kyrgyzstan Law on Investments, #7 Exhibit C - Assignment Agreement, #8 Exhibit D - Notice of Arbitration)(Berger, James) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less