This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:31:32 (UTC).

Gilleo v. Hall et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Gilleo filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Hall. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are F. Keith Ball and Carlton W. Reeves. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00891

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

Presiding Judge

Carlton W. Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raymond J. Gilleo

Bay St. Louis, MS 39520

Defendants

Warden Unknown Banks

Deputy Warden James Fillyaw

Pelicia Hall

Jerry Williams

Gloria Perry

Richard Pennington

Jane and John Does 1-100

Ron King

Raniece Matthews

Interested Party

Pro Se Department

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #4 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Raymond J. Gilleo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

3 #1

Cover Letter

2 #16

Exhibit P- Offender Recreation Program

2 #5

Exhibit E- Medication Administration

2 #7

Exhibit G- Protection from Harm

#8

RESTRICTED

2 #15

Exhibit O- Holloway Request for Administrative Remedy

#9

(#9) ORDER, pro se Plaintiff Raymond J. Gilleo shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than February 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 02/07/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER: The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/09/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

10 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Ron King, Unknown Banks, Jane and John Does 1-100, James Fillyaw, Pelicia Hall, Raniece Matthews, Richard Pennington, Gloria Perry, Jerry Williams, filed by Raymond J. Gilleo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Offender mail services, #2 Exhibit B- Clothing and Linens, #3 Exhibit C- Protective Custody, #4 Exhibit D- Facility Sanitation, #5 Exhibit E- Medication Administration, #6 Exhibit F- Offender Visitation, #7 Exhibit G- Protection from Harm, #8 Exhibit H- Special Litigation Section, #9 Exhibit I- Retaliation, #10 Exhibit Holloway How to enter the ARP Process, #11 Exhibit K- Grievance Procedures, #12 Exhibit L- Gilleo How to enter the ARP Process, #13 Exhibit M- Long Sensitive issue request, #14 Exhibit Holloway Request for Administrative Remedy, #15 Exhibit O- Holloway Request for Administrative Remedy, #16 Exhibit P- Offender Recreation Program, #17 Exhibit Q- Care of the Physical Disabled, #18 Cover Letter, #19 Envelope, #20 Notice of Assignment)(NEFs and notice of assignment mailed to Plaintiff.)(LAT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Protective Order by Raymond J. Gilleo. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(LAT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2020: #3 Affidavit - Jason Holloway, #4 Affidavit - Raymond Gilleo, #5 Affidavit - James Long) (LAT). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

6 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/09/2019. (CS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#10

(#10) Response to Order re #9 ORDER, pro se Plaintiff Raymond J. Gilleo shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than February 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 02/07/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) filed by Raymond J. Gilleo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

2 #12

Exhibit L- Gilleo How to enter the ARP Process

3 #2

Envelope

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Response to Order re #9 ORDER, pro se Plaintiff Raymond J. Gilleo shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than February 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 02/07/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) filed by Raymond J. Gilleo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER, pro se Plaintiff Raymond J. Gilleo shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than February 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 02/07/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 01/23/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Warden Brandon Zeringue] (CS) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Raymond J. Gilleo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #4 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Raymond J. Gilleo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/09/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/09/2019. (CS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Protective Order by Raymond J. Gilleo. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(LAT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2020: #3 Affidavit - Jason Holloway, #4 Affidavit - Raymond Gilleo, #5 Affidavit - James Long) (LAT). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Ron King, Unknown Banks, Jane and John Does 1-100, James Fillyaw, Pelicia Hall, Raniece Matthews, Richard Pennington, Gloria Perry, Jerry Williams, filed by Raymond J. Gilleo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Offender mail services, #2 Exhibit B- Clothing and Linens, #3 Exhibit C- Protective Custody, #4 Exhibit D- Facility Sanitation, #5 Exhibit E- Medication Administration, #6 Exhibit F- Offender Visitation, #7 Exhibit G- Protection from Harm, #8 Exhibit H- Special Litigation Section, #9 Exhibit I- Retaliation, #10 Exhibit Holloway How to enter the ARP Process, #11 Exhibit K- Grievance Procedures, #12 Exhibit L- Gilleo How to enter the ARP Process, #13 Exhibit M- Long Sensitive issue request, #14 Exhibit Holloway Request for Administrative Remedy, #15 Exhibit O- Holloway Request for Administrative Remedy, #16 Exhibit P- Offender Recreation Program, #17 Exhibit Q- Care of the Physical Disabled, #18 Cover Letter, #19 Envelope, #20 Notice of Assignment)(NEFs and notice of assignment mailed to Plaintiff.)(LAT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER REQUIRING SEPARATE COMPLAINTS. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that civil action no. 3:19cv798-HTW-LRA shall be severed into three individual actions, one for each named plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 12/4/19 (LAT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.