This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2022 at 08:03:04 (UTC).

GILL v. WRIGHT et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 GILL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WRIGHT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00345

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR

Referral Judge

JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENRY ANTOINE GILL

Defendants

SENECA EARL WRIGHT

SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM H. HARDING

Attorney at HARDING LAW OFFICES

9115 Harris Corner Parkway, Suite 220

Charlotte, NC 28269

Defendant Attorneys

DANA H. HOFFMAN

Attorney at YOUNG MOORE AND HENDERSON, P.A.

Pob 31627

Raleigh, NC 27622

MATTHEW C. BURKE

Attorney at YOUNG MOORE & HENDERSON, P.A.

3101 Glenwood Ave, Suite 200

Raleigh, NC 27612

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant SENECA EARL WRIGHT. (HOFFMAN, DANA) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by SENECA EARL WRIGHT. (HOFFMAN, DANA) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION re #3 Complaint of Dismissal of Negligent Entrustment Claim With Prejudice (Joint) by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC.. (HOFFMAN, DANA) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC. re #9 Memorandum Certificate of Word Count (HOFFMAN, DANA) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC. re #8 Answer to Complaint and Motion to Dismiss filed by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC.. (HOFFMAN, DANA) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#8

(#8) Motion to Dismiss and ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC.. (HOFFMAN, DANA) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

7 #1

Consent Form

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MATTHEW C. BURKE on behalf of Defendant SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC. (BURKE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Originally filed in Davidson County Superior Court, Case Number 22-CVS-586, and issued 3/31/2022.) (Carter, Alexus) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#4

(#4) ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney WILLIAM H. HARDING. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 6/6/2022. (Carter, Alexus) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by HENRY ANTOINE GILL. (Originally filed in Davidson County Superior Court, Case Number 22-CVS-586, and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal.) (Carter, Alexus) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC., SCHNEIDER NATIONAL, INC. identifying Corporate Parent SCHNEIDER NATIONAL, INC. for SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC... (HOFFMAN, DANA) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service of Process by Certified Mail of Defendant Schne

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant SENECA EARL WRIGHT. (HOFFMAN, DANA) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by SENECA EARL WRIGHT. (HOFFMAN, DANA) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION re #3 Complaint of Dismissal of Negligent Entrustment Claim With Prejudice (Joint) by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC.. (HOFFMAN, DANA) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC. re #9 Memorandum Certificate of Word Count (HOFFMAN, DANA) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for SENECA EARL WRIGHT. Answer due by 6/11/2022. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 5/12/2022. (Brubaker, John) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by SENECA EARL WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HOFFMAN, DANA) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC. re #8 Answer to Complaint and Motion to Dismiss filed by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC.. (HOFFMAN, DANA) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to Dismiss and ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC.. (HOFFMAN, DANA) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Carter, Alexus) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MATTHEW C. BURKE on behalf of Defendant SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC. (BURKE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Originally filed in Davidson County Superior Court, Case Number 22-CVS-586, and issued 3/31/2022.) (Carter, Alexus) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney WILLIAM H. HARDING. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 6/6/2022. (Carter, Alexus) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by HENRY ANTOINE GILL. (Originally filed in Davidson County Superior Court, Case Number 22-CVS-586, and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal.) (Carter, Alexus) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC., SCHNEIDER NATIONAL, INC. identifying Corporate Parent SCHNEIDER NATIONAL, INC. for SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC... (HOFFMAN, DANA) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3292292.), filed by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service of Process by Certified Mail of Defendant Schneider National Carriers, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (HOFFMAN, DANA) (Attachment 4 replaced on 5/5/2022 to flatten PDF.) (Carter, Alexus). (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dana H. Hoffman