This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:17:26 (UTC).

Gill v. Coakley

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Gill filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Coakley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Trumble and Gina M. Groh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00204

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert W. Trumble

Presiding Judge

Gina M. Groh

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Raymond Edward Gill

Bruceton Mills, WV 26525

Respondent

Coakley

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) LETTER from Raymond E. Gill to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 1/6/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

2 #2

Certified Mail Return Receipt

5 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

3 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#4

(#4) RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice (Other), #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/9/2019. (tlg) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

7 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Forms). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Coakley, filed by Raymond Edward Gill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

2 #1

Court-Approved Form

#6

(#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/9/2020. (tlg) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER from Raymond E. Gill to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/9/2020. (tlg) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 1/6/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice (Other), #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/9/2019. (tlg) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Forms). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Coakley, filed by Raymond Edward Gill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.