This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2022 at 05:26:08 (UTC).

Giles v. National Express Transit Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/02/2022 Giles filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against National Express Transit Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jennifer L. Thurston and Barbara A. McAuliffe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00257

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer L. Thurston

Referral Judge

Barbara A. McAuliffe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Teleia Giles

Defendants

National Express Transit Corporation

National Express LLC

Janice Curre

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lior Barkodar

205 S Beverly Drive, #211

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorney

Harold Ricky Jones, Jr.

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

50 California St., 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4615

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) REPLY by Teleia Giles to RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Remand,,,. (Barkodar, Lior) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#12

(#12) REPLY by Teleia Giles to RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Remand,,,. (Barkodar, Lior) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

11 #1

Declaration of Janice Curre ISO Opposition to Motion for Remand

11 #11

Main Document

9 #12

Proposed Order re: Motion to Remand and Request for Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. &

9 #11

Exhibit J to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar

9 #10

Exhibit I to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar

9 #9

Exhibit H to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar

9 #8

Exhibit G to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar

9 #7

Exhibit F to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar

9 #6

Exhibit E to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar

9 #5

Exhibit D to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar

9 #4

Exhibit C to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar

9 #3

Exhibit B to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar

9 #2

Exhibit A to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar

9 #1

Declaration of Lior Barkodar in Support of Motion to Remand Action to State Cour

9 #9

Main Document

#8

RESTRICTED

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY by Teleia Giles to RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Remand,,,. (Barkodar, Lior) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY by Teleia Giles to RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Remand,,,. (Barkodar, Lior) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) OPPOSITION by National Express Transit Corporation to #9 Motion to Remand,,,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Janice Curre ISO Opposition to Motion for Remand)(Jones, Harold) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to the undersigned's standing order and Local Rule 230(g), the recently filed motion to remand #9 will be decided on the papers. No hearing will be calendared. The hearing date selected by the movant will nonetheless serve to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). The parties are further informed that as a result of the judicial resource emergency described in this Court's standing order re judicial emergency, more than 80 motions remain under submission in the caseload recently re-assigned to the undersigned. Although the Court has begun the process of working through this significant backlog, it may still be many months until the motion in this matter is resolved. The Court reiterates that magistrate judge consent may alleviate some of the delays caused by the resource emergency signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on April 1, 2022.(Munoz, I) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to REMAND and Request for Fees by Teleia Giles. Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lior Barkodar in Support of Motion to Remand Action to State Court, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar, #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar, #7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar, #8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar, #9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar, #10 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar, #11 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Lior Barkodar, #12 Proposed Order re: Motion to Remand and Request for Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(b) and 1447(c))(Barkodar, Lior) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Barkodar, Lior) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Barkodar, Lior) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation. (Jones, Harold) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Kathleen B. Roney re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of CMC, #5 Exhibit E - Proof of Service of Summons, #6 Exhibit F - Answer to Complaint)(Jones, Harold) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Carrie Steben re #1 Notice of Removal. (Jones, Harold) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by National Express Transit Corporation (Jones, Harold) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from County of Stanislaus Superior Court, case number CV 22 000341 by National Express Transit Corporation. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10102649) (Jones, Harold) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL EXPRESS TRANSIT CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where National Express Group, PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harold Ricky Jones, Jr.