This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/19/2022 at 08:07:02 (UTC).

Giles et al v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 Giles filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joan N. Ericksen and David T. Schultz. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-01825

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan N. Ericksen

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Timothy Giles

Lydia Wilson

Defendants

3M Company

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Arizant Healthcare, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel M Delluomo

Attorney at Delluomo & Crow

5617 N Classen Blvd

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

Defendant Attorneys

Kay B Baxter

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 2500

New Orleans, LA 70170

Robert A Bragalone

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP - DALLAS

2200 Ross Ave, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

Benjamin W. Hulse

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

60 S. 6Th St., Suite 3100

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Amy Sherry Fischer

Attorney at Foliart, Huff, Ottaway & Bottom

201 Robert S Kerr Ave 12Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (kt) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W. Hulse on behalf of 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER re Suggestion of Remand. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 7/28/2022.(CBC) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

12 #1

*Restricted*

12 #12

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#11

(#11) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Minnesota for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Joan N. Erickson. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (km) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#10

(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel M Delluomo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Delluomo, Daniel) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Arizant Healthcare Inc . (Baxter, Kay) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by 3M Company . (Baxter, Kay) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE (other) by 3M Company re #4 Order for Response Notice of Compliance of Court's Order (Bragalone, Robert) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Robert A Bragalone on behalf of 3M Company (Bragalone, Robert) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Kay B. Baxter on behalf of 3M Company (Baxter, Kay) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#4

(#4) ENTER ORDER counsel for the parties are directed to file their entries of appearance not later than 07/11/2022...counsel for defendant is directed to comply with local counsel rule. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 07/06/2022. (lam) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE (other) by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Notice of Removal (Fischer, Amy) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/05/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - JJ Removal

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Amended Petition

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • Docket(#18) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE:Case transferred from Minnesota has been opened in Western District of Oklahoma[LIVE] as case 5:22-cv-00690, filed 08/12/2022. (kt) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Docket(#17) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Western District of Oklahoma. (kt) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (kt) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W. Hulse on behalf of 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER re Suggestion of Remand. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 7/28/2022.(CBC) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • Docket(#13) (Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file IN RE: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Bair MDL website at: # www.mnd.uscourts.gov/mdl-cases . (kt) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Western; Case Number 5:22-cv-00559. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz per MDL List. (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Minnesota for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Joan N. Erickson. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (km) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel M Delluomo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Delluomo, Daniel) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Arizant Healthcare Inc . (Baxter, Kay) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by 3M Company . (Baxter, Kay) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE (other) by 3M Company re #4 Order for Response Notice of Compliance of Court's Order (Bragalone, Robert) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Robert A Bragalone on behalf of 3M Company (Bragalone, Robert) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Kay B. Baxter on behalf of 3M Company (Baxter, Kay) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTER ORDER counsel for the parties are directed to file their entries of appearance not later than 07/11/2022...counsel for defendant is directed to comply with local counsel rule. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 07/06/2022. (lam) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE (other) by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Notice of Removal (Fischer, Amy) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Amy Sherry Fischer on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Fischer, Amy) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE 5:22-cv-00559 Timothy Giles Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3940899. (Baxter, Kay) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Comanche County District Court, case number CJ-22-219 filed by Arizant Healthcare Inc, 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - JJ Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rr) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 7/21/2022.] (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arizant Healthcare, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where 3M COMPANY is a litigant