This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2022 at 07:34:35 (UTC).

Gilder v. BNPC, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2022 Gilder filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against BNPC, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00224

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Willie Gilder

Defendants

BNPC, LLC

Servpro of Montgomery County, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin A. Matthews

Attorney at Jackson, Shields, Yeiser, Holt, Speakman & Lucas

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Gordon E. Jackson

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

J. Russ Bryant

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

Robert E. Morelli, III

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

Robert E. Turner, IV

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Consent to Join

1 #2

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (dt) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons issued as to BNPC, LLC and Servpro of Montgomery County, LLC. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2022 at 3:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Willie Gilder. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE #7 GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESET for 6/30/2022 at 3:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/24/2022. (bs) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE #7 GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESET for 6/30/2022 at 3:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/24/2022. (bs) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Willie Gilder. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2022 at 3:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons issued as to BNPC, LLC and Servpro of Montgomery County, LLC. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Gordon E. Jackson, J. Russ Bryant, Robert E. Turner, IV, Robert E. Morelli, III and Benjamin A. Matthews admitted to this court. (dt) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (dt) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BNPC, LLC and Servpro of Montgomery County, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3566132), filed by Willie Gilder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Alan Matthews

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E. Morelli, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Russ Bryant