This case was last updated from PACER on 09/27/2020 at 11:48:56 (UTC).

Gilcrease v. Chevron USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 Gilcrease filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Chevron USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald C. Griffin and David Counts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00183

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ronald C. Griffin

Presiding Judge

David Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Gilcrease, Jr.

Defendant

Chevron USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew W. Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Richard M. Schreiber

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorneys

Jesika J. Silva Blanco

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright U.S. LLP

1301 Mckinney St.,Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010

Kimberly Frances Cheeseman

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77010

Michael Carter Crow

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly Frances Cheeseman on behalf of Chevron USA, Inc. . Attorney Kimberly Frances Cheeseman added to party Chevron USA, Inc. (pty:dft) (Cheeseman, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jesika J. Silva Blanco on behalf of Chevron USA, Inc. . Attorney Jesika J. Silva Blanco added to party Chevron USA, Inc. (pty:dft) (Silva Blanco, Jesika) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Michael Carter Crow added to party Chevron USA, Inc. (pty:dft) by Chevron USA, Inc..(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Gilcrease, Jr. Chevron USA, Inc. served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Schreiber, Richard) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Gilcrease, Jr. Chevron USA, Inc. served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Schreiber, Richard) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Chevron USA, Inc. (slt) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard M. Schreiber on behalf of Robert Gilcrease, Jr. Attorney Richard M. Schreiber added to party Robert Gilcrease, Jr(pty:pla) (Schreiber, Richard) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Robert Gilcrease, Jr. Attorney Andrew W. Dunlap added to party Robert Gilcrease, Jr(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Robert Gilcrease, Jr. (Josephson, Michael) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/30/2020) (slt). Modified to replace with flattened pdf on 7/30/2020 (slt). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Consent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13810825), filed by Robert Gilcrease, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/30/2020) (slt). Modified to replace coversheet with flattened pdf on 7/30/2020 (slt). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly Frances Cheeseman on behalf of Chevron USA, Inc. . Attorney Kimberly Frances Cheeseman added to party Chevron USA, Inc. (pty:dft) (Cheeseman, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jesika J. Silva Blanco on behalf of Chevron USA, Inc. . Attorney Jesika J. Silva Blanco added to party Chevron USA, Inc. (pty:dft) (Silva Blanco, Jesika) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Michael Carter Crow added to party Chevron USA, Inc. (pty:dft) by Chevron USA, Inc..(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Gilcrease, Jr. Chevron USA, Inc. served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Schreiber, Richard) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Gilcrease, Jr. Chevron USA, Inc. served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Schreiber, Richard) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Chevron USA, Inc. (slt) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (slt) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard M. Schreiber on behalf of Robert Gilcrease, Jr. Attorney Richard M. Schreiber added to party Robert Gilcrease, Jr(pty:pla) (Schreiber, Richard) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Robert Gilcrease, Jr. Attorney Andrew W. Dunlap added to party Robert Gilcrease, Jr(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Robert Gilcrease, Jr. (Josephson, Michael) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/30/2020) (slt). Modified to replace with flattened pdf on 7/30/2020 (slt). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13810825), filed by Robert Gilcrease, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/30/2020) (slt). Modified to replace coversheet with flattened pdf on 7/30/2020 (slt). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chevron USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Carter Crow

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Cheeseman