This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2020 at 12:05:09 (UTC).

Gilberto Zambrano v. Red Dot Storage et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Gilberto Zambrano filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Red Dot Storage. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z. Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Defendants

Red Dot Storage 14, LLC

Red Dot Storage 86 (1220 Elgin), LLC

Red Dot Storage 18, LLC

Red Dot Storage 3, LLC

Red Dot Storage 40 (399 Antioch), LLC

Red Dot Storage 9, LLC

Red Dot Storage 15, LLC

Red Dot Storage 78 (740 Woodstock), LLC

Red Dot Storage 19, LLC

Red Dot Storage 65 (East Peoria), LLC

Red Dot Storage 26 (Troy), LLC

Red Dot Storage 11, LLC

Red Dot Management, LLC

Red Dot Storage 1 (Sandy-Hollow-Rockford), LLC

Red Dot Storage 4, LLC

Red Dot Storage 39 (284 Antioch), LLC

Red Dot Storage 16, LLC

Red Dot Storage 42 (Oswego), LLC

Red Dot Storage 38 (North Aurora), LLC

Red Dot Storage 12, LLC

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Brian W. Lewis

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

One North Wacker Drive, Suite 4400

Chicago, IL 60606

Erin Marie Pauley

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

One N. Wacker Drive, Suite 4400

Chicago, IL 60601

Robert Thomas Hanlon

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert T. Hanlon & Associates, P.C.

131 East Calhoun Street

Woodstock, IL 60098

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 2/26/19. If the Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he should file a motion for leave to do so by 3/8/19. This case is otherwise stayed. Status hearing set for 4/10/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#22

(#22) MEMORANDUM by Gilberto Zambrano in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,, #8 (Hanlon, Robert) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#21

(#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Unopposed motion to extend the briefing schedule and file instanter #20 is granted. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss shall be due by 2/21/19; reply due by 3/10/19. Counsel should file his response on the docket today. Counsel is cautioned that in the future, he must comply with the Court's deadlines and move for leave to extend those deadlines prior to their expiration. Counsel is further cautioned to comply with Local Rule 5.3(b), which specifies that all motions must be accompanied by a separate notice of motion specifying the date and time on which, and the judge before whom, the motion is to be presented.No appearance is required on the motion. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#20

(#20) MOTION by Plaintiff Gilberto Zambrano for extension of time to file response/reply as to notice of motion #9 , notice of motion #17 , memorandum in support of motion,,,,, #10 , MOTION by Plaintiff Gilberto Zambrano to file instanter (Hanlon, Robert) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#19

(#19) STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Red Dot Storage (Pauley, Erin) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#18

(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:.Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss #8 shall be due by 2/13/19; reply due by 2/27/19. Motion to continue #12 is stricken as moot. There is no need to re-notice the motions as provided in #15 . Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#17

(#17) Re- NOTICE of Motion by Erin Marie Pauley for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,, #8 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pauley, Erin) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#12

(#13) NOTICE of Motion by Robert Thomas Hanlon for presentment of motion to continue #12 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/17/2001 at 09:30 AM. (Hanlon, Robert) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#10

(#20) MOTION by Plaintiff Gilberto Zambrano for extension of time to file response/reply as to notice of motion #9 , notice of motion #17 , memorandum in support of motion,,,,, #10 , MOTION by Plaintiff Gilberto Zambrano to file instanter (Hanlon, Robert) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sparkplug Capital, LLC by Brian W. Lewis (Lewis, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by Sparkplug Capital, LLC (Lewis, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lewis, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Secretary of State Elk Mountain

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Secretary of State Capital

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Secretary of State Holdings

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Affidavit

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Summons, Complaint and Docket

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from McHenry Circuit Court, case number (18-LA-000408) filed by Sparkplug Capital, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15335566. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, Complaint and Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Secretary of State Holdings, #4 Exhibit 4 - Secretary of State Capital, #5 Exhibit 5 - Secretary of State Elk Mountain)(Lewis, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 2/26/19. If the Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he should file a motion for leave to do so by 3/8/19. This case is otherwise stayed. Status hearing set for 4/10/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MEMORANDUM by Gilberto Zambrano in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,, #8 (Hanlon, Robert) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Unopposed motion to extend the briefing schedule and file instanter #20 is granted. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss shall be due by 2/21/19; reply due by 3/10/19. Counsel should file his response on the docket today. Counsel is cautioned that in the future, he must comply with the Court's deadlines and move for leave to extend those deadlines prior to their expiration. Counsel is further cautioned to comply with Local Rule 5.3(b), which specifies that all motions must be accompanied by a separate notice of motion specifying the date and time on which, and the judge before whom, the motion is to be presented.No appearance is required on the motion. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION by Plaintiff Gilberto Zambrano for extension of time to file response/reply as to notice of motion #9 , notice of motion #17 , memorandum in support of motion,,,,, #10 , MOTION by Plaintiff Gilberto Zambrano to file instanter (Hanlon, Robert) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Red Dot Storage (Pauley, Erin) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:.Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss #8 shall be due by 2/13/19; reply due by 2/27/19. Motion to continue #12 is stricken as moot. There is no need to re-notice the motions as provided in #15 . Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Re- NOTICE of Motion by Erin Marie Pauley for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,, #8 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pauley, Erin) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 2/26/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: In light of the reassignment, the motion hearings noticed before Judge Bucklo are stricken. The motions are to be re-noticed before Judge Lee consistent with his Standing Order. No appearance is required on 1/17/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Motion by Robert Thomas Hanlon for presentment of motion to continue #12 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/17/2001 at 09:30 AM. (Hanlon, Robert) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Motion by Erin Marie Pauley for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,, #8 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/17/2019 at 09:30 PM. (Pauley, Erin) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Red Dot Management, LLC, Red Dot Storage, Red Dot Storage 1 (Sandy-Hollow-Rockford), LLC, Red Dot Storage 1, LLC, Red Dot Storage 11, LLC, Red Dot Storage 12, LLC, Red Dot Storage 13, LLC, Red Dot Storage 14, LLC, Red Dot Storage 15, LLC, Red Dot Storage 16, LLC, Red Dot Storage 17, LLC, Red Dot Storage 18, LLC, Red Dot Storage 19, LLC, Red Dot Storage 2, LLC, Red Dot Storage 20, LLC, Red Dot Storage 21 (Richton Park), LLC, Red Dot Storage 22 (Monee), LLC, Red Dot Storage 23 (Gurnee), LLC, Red Dot Storage 24 (Highland), LLC, Red Dot Storage 25 (Collinsville), LLC, Red Dot Storage 26 (Troy), LLC, Red Dot Storage 3, LLC, Red Dot Storage 32 (Bloomington), LLC, Red Dot Storage 36 (Decatur), LLC, Red Dot Storage 38 (North Aurora), LLC, Red Dot Storage 39 (284 Antioch), LLC, Red Dot Storage 39 (North Aurora), LLC, Red Dot Storage 4, LLC, Red Dot Storage 40 (399 Antioch), LLC, Red Dot Storage 42 (Oswego), LLC, Red Dot Storage 45 (71 Highland), LLC, Red Dot Storage 6, LLC, Red Dot Storage 65 (East Peoria), LLC, Red Dot Storage 7, LLC, Red Dot Storage 78 (740 Woodstock), LLC, Red Dot Storage 8, LLC, Red Dot Storage 86 (1220 Elgin), LLC, Red Dot Storage 9, LLC, Red Dot Storage 94 (19301 Glenwood), LLC, Red Dot Storage Management Services, LLC, Sparkplug Capital, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pauley, Erin) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, ) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, ) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, ) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sparkplug Capital, LLC by Erin Marie Pauley (Pauley, Erin) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sparkplug Capital, LLC by Brian W. Lewis (Lewis, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by Sparkplug Capital, LLC (Lewis, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lewis, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from McHenry Circuit Court, case number (18-LA-000408) filed by Sparkplug Capital, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15335566. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, Complaint and Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Secretary of State Holdings, #4 Exhibit 4 - Secretary of State Capital, #5 Exhibit 5 - Secretary of State Elk Mountain)(Lewis, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin Marie Pauley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian W. Lewis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Thomas Hanlon