This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2022 at 10:11:35 (UTC).

Gilbert v. QVC, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 Gilbert filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against QVC, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Halil S. Ozerden and Bradley W. Rath. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00225

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Halil S. Ozerden

Referral Judge

Bradley W. Rath

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Douglas Gilbert

Defendants

QVC, Inc.

Cheer Master Trading, LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Douglas L. Tynes, Jr.

Attorney at TYNES LAW FIRM, PA

P. O. Box 966

Pascagoula, MS 39568

Adam John Kress - PHV

Attorney at JOHNSON BECKER, PLLC

444 Cedar Street, Suite 1800

St. Paul, MN 55101

Defendant Attorneys

Fred E. Bourn, III

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP-Ridgeland

P. O. Box 6010, 1020 Highland Colony Pkwy., Ste. 1400 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Lindley Anna Little Morris

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP-Ridgeland

P. O. Box 6010, 1020 Highland Colony Pkwy., Ste. 1400 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Cheer Master Trading, LTD., QVC, Inc. (JCH) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Gilbert. QVC, Inc. served on 9/2/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (Tynes, Douglas) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by QVC, Inc. (Bourn, Fred) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindley Anna Little Morris on behalf of QVC, Inc. (Morris, Lindley Anna) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by QVC, Inc..(Morris, Lindley Anna) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by QVC, Inc..(Morris, Lindley Anna) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Attorney Adam John Kress be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff Douglas Gilbert in association with local counsel conditioned upon completion of the registration procedures found on the Court's website and at the following link: https://www.mssd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-page. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 10/4/2022 (AB) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5. Counsel should use the correct Judge's initials on future filings. 1:22cv225HSO-BWR. (wld) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindley Anna Little Morris on behalf of QVC, Inc. (Morris, Lindley Anna) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Adam John Kress to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4947283) by Douglas Gilbert (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Tynes, Douglas) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline. The deadline for QVC, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is 10/13/2022. NO FURTHER ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 9/30/22 (HM) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by QVC, Inc. (Bourn, Fred) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Gilbert. QVC, Inc. served on 9/2/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (Tynes, Douglas) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketIssued summons emailed to attorney to email address listed on docket. (JCH) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Cheer Master Trading, LTD., QVC, Inc. (JCH) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Cheer Master Trading, LTD., QVC, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 391), filed by Douglas Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less