This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2022 at 07:18:41 (UTC).

Gilbert v. Berman & Rabin, P.A. et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 Gilbert filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Berman Rabin, P A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric F. Melgren and Teresa J. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02597

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric F. Melgren

Referral Judge

Teresa J. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jay D. Gilbert

Defendants

Berman & Rabin, P.A.

Great Southern Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan J. Stecklein

Michael H. Rapp

Samuel Edward Miller

Matthew S. Robertson

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5670665.), filed by Jay D. Gilbert.(Robertson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jay D. Gilbert. (Robertson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#3

(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Jay D. Gilbert - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Robertson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jay D. Gilbert upon Great Southern Bank served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022 (Robertson, Matthew) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jay D. Gilbert upon Berman & Rabin, P.A. served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022 (Robertson, Matthew) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jay D. Gilbert upon Berman & Rabin, P.A. served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022 (Robertson, Matthew) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jay D. Gilbert upon Great Southern Bank served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022 (Robertson, Matthew) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Berman & Rabin, P.A., Great Southern Bank. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Jay D. Gilbert - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Robertson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jay D. Gilbert. (Robertson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5670665.), filed by Jay D. Gilbert.(Robertson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less