This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2021 at 08:29:50 (UTC).

Gilbert v. Antelope Associates Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Gilbert filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Antelope Associates Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and Deborah Barnes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02021

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darren Gilbert

Defendants

Antelope Associates Inc. Doing business as 7-Eleven

7-Eleven

7-Eleven, Inc.

Benjamin Lesser

Nicole Lesser

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tanya E. Moore

Attorney at Moore Law Firm, P.C.

300 South First St.Suite 342

San Jose, CA 95113

Defendant Attorneys

Michael S. Orr

Attorney at Call & Jensen

610 Newport Center Drivesuite 700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Annie Robbins Embree

Attorney at Embree Law

4465 Granite Drive Suite 1011

Rocklin, CA 95677

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *7-Eleven, Inc., Antelope Associates Inc., Benjamin Lesser, Nicole Lesser* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tanya E. Moore* *Moore Law Firm, P.C.* *300 South First Street, Suite 342* *San Jose, CA 95113*. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Standing Order

3 #2

Consent Form

3 #3

VDRP

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: 7-Eleven, Inc. served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Moore, Tanya) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Antelope Associates Inc. served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Moore, Tanya) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand by 7-Eleven, Inc., Antelope Associates Inc.. Attorney Orr, Michael S. added.(Orr, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by 7-Eleven, Inc., Antelope Associates Inc.. (Orr, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/8/2021 STAYING this action and VACATING the 3/10/22 Initial Scheduling Conference. The parties are DIRECTED to promptly meet and confer to discuss settlement of thisaction. If parties have not been able to informally reach a settlement within 45 days, the parties shall initiate participation in the court's VDRP Program. (cc VDRP Coordinator) (Donati, J) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Benjamin Lesser, Nicole Lesser. Attorney Embree, Annie Robbins added. (Embree, Annie) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Benjamin Lesser served on 11/21/2021. (Moore, Tanya) Modified on 12/22/2021 (Coll, A). (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Nicole Lesser served on 11/18/2021. (Moore, Tanya) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Nicole Lesser served on 11/18/2021. (Moore, Tanya) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Benjamin Lesser served on 11/21/2021. (Moore, Tanya) Modified on 12/22/2021 (Coll, A). (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Benjamin Lesser, Nicole Lesser. Attorney Embree, Annie Robbins added. (Embree, Annie) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/8/2021 STAYING this action and VACATING the 3/10/22 Initial Scheduling Conference. The parties are DIRECTED to promptly meet and confer to discuss settlement of thisaction. If parties have not been able to informally reach a settlement within 45 days, the parties shall initiate participation in the court's VDRP Program. (cc VDRP Coordinator) (Donati, J) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by 7-Eleven, Inc., Antelope Associates Inc.. (Orr, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand by 7-Eleven, Inc., Antelope Associates Inc.. Attorney Orr, Michael S. added.(Orr, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Antelope Associates Inc. served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Moore, Tanya) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: 7-Eleven, Inc. served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Moore, Tanya) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 3/10/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *7-Eleven, Inc., Antelope Associates Inc., Benjamin Lesser, Nicole Lesser* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tanya E. Moore* *Moore Law Firm, P.C.* *300 South First Street, Suite 342* *San Jose, CA 95113*. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Asserting Denial of Right of Access Under the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA) against All Defendants by Darren Gilbert. Attorney Moore, Tanya E. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9906556) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Tanya) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 7-Eleven Inc is a litigant