This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2021 at 10:37:50 (UTC).

Gilbert v. American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 Gilbert filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02621

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Judson Gilbert

Defendant

American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derek Clinton Brasher

Attorney at Brasher Law Firm (BEAU)

1122 Orleans St

Beaumont, TX 77701

Joseph Muckleroy

Attorney at Brasher Law Firm (BEAU)

1122 Orleans St

Beaumont, TX 77701

Nishi Vimal Kothari

Attorney at Brasher Law Firm (BEAU)

1122 Orleans St

Beaumont, TX 77701

Defendant Attorneys

Gordon P Serou, Jr

Attorney at Law Office of Gordon P Serou Jr

365 Canal St Ste 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Brian Jacob D'Angelo

Attorney at Law Office of Brian J D'Angelo

220 Josie Ct

Belle Chasse, LA 70037

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Judson Gilbert. American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (aty,Muckleroy, Joseph) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida identifying Corporate Parent Assurant Inc for American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida. (aty,Serou, Gordon) (Entered: 09/11/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida.(Attorney Gordon P Serou, Jr added to party American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida(pty:dft))(aty,Serou, Gordon) (Entered: 09/11/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4782926) filed by Judson Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Derek Clinton Brasher added to party Judson Gilbert(pty:pla))(aty,Brasher, Derek) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Judson Gilbert. American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (aty,Muckleroy, Joseph) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida identifying Corporate Parent Assurant Inc for American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida. (aty,Serou, Gordon) (Entered: 09/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida.(Attorney Gordon P Serou, Jr added to party American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida(pty:dft))(aty,Serou, Gordon) (Entered: 09/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Bankers Insurance Co of Florida. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketJudge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay added. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4782926) filed by Judson Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Derek Clinton Brasher added to party Judson Gilbert(pty:pla))(aty,Brasher, Derek) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant