This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2020 at 08:55:31 (UTC).

Gila River Indian Community v. 99 Ranch LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 Gila River Indian Community filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 99 Ranch LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric J Markovich and Rosemary Marquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00103

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Eric J Markovich

Rosemary Marquez

 

Party Details

Defendants

M N LLC

Richard M Kaler

Francisco R Serna

Ruth Bible

The Householder Family, Limited Partnership

Scott K Bryce

Diane Rowley

Sheila Bodine

Kaler Ranch LLC

Blanca E Bowman

Robert K Lundell

Marian R Lunt

Lorenz Thelen

Curtis Canal Company of the Gila Valley Irrigation District

Marcella D Harris

Marilyn A Starr

Tommy C Clonts

Catherine M Corum

Ft Thomas Unified School District No 7

Kenneth S Claridge

129 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Garrett Wilford Perkins

Attorney at Brown & Brown Law Office PC - St Johns, AZ

P.O. Box 1890

St Johns, AZ 85936

David Albert Brown

Attorney at Brown & Brown Law Offices PC

P.O. Box 1890

St Johns, AZ 85936

J Albert Brown

Attorney at Brown & Brown Law Office PC - St Johns, AZ

P.O. Box 1890

St Johns, AZ 85936

Richard Rae Carpenter

Attorney at Wright Welker & Pauole PLC

10429 S 51St St., Ste. 285

Phoenix, AZ 85044

Christopher Scott Welker

Attorney at Wright Welker & Pauole PLC

10429 S 51St St., Ste. 285

Phoenix, AZ 85044

Other Attorneys

Jason Travis Hauter

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP - Washington, DC

2001 K St. Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Linus Everling

Attorney at Gila River Indian Community - Sacaton, AZ

P.O. Box 97

Sacaton, AZ 85147

Thomas L Murphy

Attorney at Gila River Indian Community - Sacaton, AZ

P.O. Box 97

Sacaton, AZ 85147

Merrill C Godfrey

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP - Washington, DC

2001 K St. Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Donald R Pongrace

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP - Washington, DC

2001 K St. Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Riley Squire Snow

Attorney at Law Office of Riley S Snow PLC

14362 N Frank Lloyd Wright Blvd., Ste. 1000

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Sean Thomas Hood

Attorney at Fennemore Craig PC - Phoenix, AZ

2394 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Bradley John Pew

Attorney at Fennemore Craig PC - Phoenix, AZ

2394 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#152

#151

#150

#149

#148

#147

#146

#145

#144

1 #9

Exhibit A part 8

1 #8

Exhibit A part 7

1 #7

Exhibit A part 6

1 #6

Exhibit A part 5

1 #5

Exhibit A part 4

1 #4

Exhibit A part 3

1 #3

Exhibit A part 2

1 #2

Exhibit A part

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

450 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#152) NOTICE of Appearance by David Albert Brown on behalf of Cunningham Properties Limited Partnership, Robert K Lundell, Thatcher 910 LLC. (Brown, David) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kay A Goodman, Matthew M Goodman, Alma M Saline, Sammy L Smith: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 04/30/2020 to Alma Saline, Matthew Goodman, Kay Goodman & Sammy Smith Acceptance of Service. (Brown, David) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Householder Family, Limited Partnership on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Thatcher 910, LLC on 04/27/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon DMMK FP LLC on 04/20/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon 99 Ranch, LLC on 4/20/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#146) NOTICE of Appearance by David Albert Brown on behalf of Sam M Angle, Donna R Burden, Catherine M Corum, DMMK FP LLC, Duncan, Town of, Alice M Ellsworth, Geronimo FRC LLC, Kay A Goodman, Matthew M Goodman, Jason Howard, Stephanie Howard, John L Lacey, Jeffrey B Larson, Lance Layton, Sherri Layton, Mt. Graham Hospital District, Mt. Graham Regional Medical Center Incorporated, Franklin B Ross. (Brown, David) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#145) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Karyn Norton on 4/15/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#144) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Sanford L. Saline on 4/15/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#143) NOTICE of Appearance by David Albert Brown on behalf of Ruth Bible, Gary D Bowen, Bradley E Boyd, Denise Brooks, Edwin J Busby, Dawn Carabeo, John R Carabeo, Danny Carrell, Richard W Clark, Brenda K Colvin, Jay D Colvin, Amanda D Conyer, Core Ag LLC, William Cull, Myrna J Curtis, Jimmie G Gomez, Dee L Hancock, Jace Hancock, Lynn M Hancock, Monica B Hancock, Kenneth B Harrington, Marcella D Harris, Ralph E Harris, Brenda Hinton Harvey, Molli A Haught, Tom L Haught, Richard M Kaler, Kaler Ranch LLC, Gregory R Larson, Layton & Sons LLC, Linda C Lewis, Rosanna E Lopez, Dale S Lunt, Gerald Ray Lunt, Jeane N Lunt, Jennifer B Lunt, John B Lunt, Julee Ann Lunt, Lucia Lunt, Merelene T Lunt, Nelson B Lunt, Samuel Lee Lunt, Lunt's Dairy, M N LLC, Nedra MacLay, North Shore River Side LLC, Karyn Norton, Marion S Pina, Mary L Price, Jana L Reed, Richard Reed, Linda S Reeves, Melvyn K Reeves, Leon J Reynolds, Janell Richins, Sammie M Roden, Diane Rowley, Larry D Rowley, Alma M Saline, Sanford L Saline, Daniel Sanchez, Francisco R Serna, Marlene N Serna, Joyce T Skinner, Lynn W Skinner, Sammy L Smith, Charlene L Stacy, Dennis E Stacy, Douglas D Stacy, Linda M Stacy, Priscilla O Starkweather, Robert R Starkweather, Lorenz Thelen, Nancy A Thelen, Janette B Tyler, Mervin J Wilhelm, Roxanne Wilhelm. (Brown, David) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Magistrate Election Form Deadline resent to Plaintiff x2. (DLC) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Sammie M Roden. (LML). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Leon J Reynolds, Janell Richins, Franklin B Ross, Diane Rowley, Larry D Rowley, Alma M Saline, Sanford L Saline, Francisco R Serna, Marlene N Serna, Kim Sherwood, Matthew Sherwood, Joyce T Skinner, Lynn W Skinner, Sammy L Smith, Charlene L Stacy, Dennis E Stacy, Douglas D Stacy, Linda M Stacy, Priscilla O Starkweather, Robert R Starkweather, Jacob E Starr, Marilyn A Starr, Thatcher 910 LLC, Lorenz Thelen, Nancy A Thelen, Janette B Tyler, Mervin J Wilhelm, Roxanne Wilhelm. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons)(LML). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. Modified on 3/27/2020 (LML). Modified on 3/27/2020 to remove defendant names to which summons were not submitted (LML). (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to 99 Ranch LLC, Sam M Angle, Marcelino M Aragon, Ruth Bible, Daniel Bodine, Sheila Bodine, Gary D Bowen, Blanca E Bowman, Gilligan O Bowman, Sara C Bowman, Terry O Bowman, Bradley E Boyd, Denise Brooks, Barbara L Bryce, Gary A Bryce, Scott K Bryce, Wendy K Bryce, Donna R Burden, Edwin J Busby, Kelly D Cambern, Joe B Cannon, Dawn Carabeo, John R Carabeo, Danny Carrell, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Kenneth S Claridge, Richard W Clark, Betty J Clonts, Tommy C Clonts, Brenda K Colvin, Gary R Colvin, Jay D Colvin, Amanda D Conyer, Core Ag, LLC and/or Nopal Cactus Farms LLC, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Catherine M Corum, William Cull, Cunningham Properties Limited Partnership, Myrna J Curtis, Curtis Canal Company of the Gila Valley Irrigation District, DMMK FP LLC, Duncan Unified School District No. 2, Duncan, Town of, Alice M Ellsworth, Freeport-McMoran Safford Incorporated, Ft Thomas Unified School District No 7, Geronimo FRC LLC, Gila Valley Irrigation District, Jimmie G Gomez, Kay A Goodman, Matthew M Goodman, Graham County Community College District, Dee L Hancock, Jace Hancock, John C Hancock, Lynn M Hancock, Monica B Hancock, Keith Hansen, Margaret Elizabeth Hansen, Kenneth B Harrington, Marcella D Harris, Ralph E Harris, Brenda Hinton Harvey, Molli A Haught, Tom L Haught, Norma G Henderson, Elizabeth Hinton, Max T Hinton, Dalia M Hirko, Clarice H Holder, James F Holder, The Householder Family Limited Partnership, Jason Howard, Stephanie Howard, Richard M Kaler, Kaler Ranch LLC, John L Lacey, Karen M Lacey, Gregory R Larson, Jeffrey B Larson, Marilyn P Larson, Lance Layton, Sherri Layton, Layton & Sons LLC, Linda C Lewis, Rosanna E Lopez, Robert K Lundell, Colleen M. Lunt, Dale S Lunt, Gerald Ray Lunt, Jeane N. Lunt, Jennifer B Lunt, John B Lunt, Julee Ann Lunt, Lucia Lunt, Marian R Lunt, Merelene T Lunt, Nelson B Lunt, Richard G Lunt, Samuel Lee Lunt, Wilbur H Lunt, Lunt's Dairy, M N LLC, Nedra MacLay, Lawrence K McGarry, Alex E Morales Jr., Mt. Graham Hospital District, Mt. Graham Regional Medical Center Incorporated, Janice Munson, North Shore River Side LLC, Karyn Norton, Marion S Pina, Mary L Price, Jana L Reed, Richard Reed, Linda S Reeves, Melvyn K Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons, #43 Summons, #44 Summons, #45 Summons, #46 Summons, #47 Summons, #48 Summons, #49 Summons, #50 Summons, #51 Summons, #52 Summons, #53 Summons, #54 Summons, #55 Summons, #56 Summons, #57 Summons, #58 Summons, #59 Summons, #60 Summons, #61 Summons, #62 Summons, #63 Summons, #64 Summons, #65 Summons, #66 Summons, #67 Summons, #68 Summons, #69 Summons, #70 Summons, #71 Summons, #72 Summons, #73 Summons, #74 Summons, #75 Summons, #76 Summons, #77 Summons, #78 Summons, #79 Summons, #80 Summons, #81 Summons, #82 Summons, #83 Summons, #84 Summons, #85 Summons, #86 Summons, #87 Summons, #88 Summons, #89 Summons, #90 Summons, #91 Summons, #92 Summons, #93 Summons, #94 Summons, #95 Summons, #96 Summons, #97 Summons, #98 Summons, #99 Summons, #100 Summons, #101 Summons, #102 Summons, #103 Summons, #104 Summons, #105 Summons, #106 Summons, #107 Summons, #108 Summons, #109 Summons, #110 Summons, #111 Summons, #112 Summons, #113 Summons, #114 Summons, #115 Summons, #116 Summons, #117 Summons, #118 Summons, #119 Summons)(LML). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. Modified on 3/23/2020 to include all appropriate parties (LML). (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Submitted by Gila River Indian Community. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons)(Godfrey, Merrill) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Submitted by Gila River Indian Community. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons, #43 Summons, #44 Summons, #45 Summons, #46 Summons, #47 Summons, #48 Summons, #49 Summons, #50 Summons, #51 Summons, #52 Summons, #53 Summons, #54 Summons, #55 Summons, #56 Summons, #57 Summons, #58 Summons, #59 Summons, #60 Summons, #61 Summons, #62 Summons, #63 Summons, #64 Summons, #65 Summons, #66 Summons, #67 Summons, #68 Summons, #69 Summons, #70 Summons, #71 Summons, #72 Summons, #73 Summons, #74 Summons, #75 Summons, #76 Summons, #77 Summons, #78 Summons, #79 Summons, #80 Summons, #81 Summons, #82 Summons, #83 Summons, #84 Summons, #85 Summons, #86 Summons, #87 Summons, #88 Summons, #89 Summons, #90 Summons, #91 Summons, #92 Summons, #93 Summons, #94 Summons, #95 Summons, #96 Summons, #97 Summons, #98 Summons, #99 Summons, #100 Summons, #101 Summons, #102 Summons, #103 Summons, #104 Summons, #105 Summons, #106 Summons, #107 Summons, #108 Summons, #109 Summons, #110 Summons, #111 Summons, #112 Summons, #113 Summons, #114 Summons, #115 Summons, #116 Summons, #117 Summons, #118 Summons, #119 Summons)(Godfrey, Merrill) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Donald R Pongrace and Merrill C Godfrey on behalf of Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18054357. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eric J Markovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00103-TUC-EJM. Magistrate Election form attached.(BAC) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18054357 filed by Gila River Indian Community.(Godfrey, Merrill) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A part, #3 Exhibit A part 2, #4 Exhibit A part 3, #5 Exhibit A part 4, #6 Exhibit A part 5, #7 Exhibit A part 6, #8 Exhibit A part 7, #9 Exhibit A part 8, #10 Exhibit A part 9, #11 Exhibit A part 10, #12 Exhibit A part 11)(BAC) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M N LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas L Murphy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Thomas Hood

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Merrill C. Godfrey