This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2021 at 09:19:40 (UTC).

GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY et al v. ALEX AZAR et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY filed an Other lawsuit against ALEX AZAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher R. Cooper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03398

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher R. Cooper

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GILA RIVER HEALTH CARE CORPORATION

GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY

Defendants

ALEX AZAR

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

REAR ADM. MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE

MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE

ALEX M. AZAR, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James K. Nichols

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY LLP

50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Vernle Charles Durocher, Jr.

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY LLP

50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/7/2020 (Nichols, James) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#9

(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/8/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/6/2021. (Nichols, James) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/07/2020. (Nichols, James) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Vernle Charles Durocher, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Durocher, Vernle) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/1/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/30/2021. (Nichols, James) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

5 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmd) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by GILA RIVER HEALTH CARE CORPORATION, GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY. Case related to Case No. 1:19-CV-03550. (Nichols, James) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#3

(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GILA RIVER HEALTH CARE CORPORATION, GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY (Nichols, James) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

2 #1

Complaint

#2

(#2) ERRATA for Complaint filed without being dated by GILA RIVER HEALTH CARE CORPORATION, GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Nichols, James) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

1 #7

RULE 26 FORM

1 #6

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF RELATED CIVIL CASES PENDING

1 #5

Summons MICHAEL R. SHERWIN

1 #4

Summons WILLIAM BARR

1 #3

Summons REAR ADM. MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE

1 #2

Summons ALEX M. AZAR

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/7/2020 (Nichols, James) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/8/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/6/2021. (Nichols, James) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/07/2020. (Nichols, James) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Vernle Charles Durocher, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Durocher, Vernle) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/1/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/30/2021. (Nichols, James) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmd) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by GILA RIVER HEALTH CARE CORPORATION, GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY. Case related to Case No. 1:19-CV-03550. (Nichols, James) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GILA RIVER HEALTH CARE CORPORATION, GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY (Nichols, James) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ERRATA for Complaint filed without being dated by GILA RIVER HEALTH CARE CORPORATION, GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Nichols, James) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALEX AZAR, REAR ADM. MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7870372) filed by GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY, GILA RIVER HEALTH CARE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons ALEX M. AZAR, #3 Summons REAR ADM. MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE, #4 Summons WILLIAM BARR, #5 Summons MICHAEL R. SHERWIN, #6 NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF RELATED CIVIL CASES PENDING, #7 RULE 26 FORM)(Nichols, James) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vernle C Durocher, Jr