This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:49:57 (UTC).

Gil v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Gil filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Raag Singhal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-60126

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raag Singhal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francisco Gil

Defendant

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jibrael Jarallah Said Hindi

Attorney at The Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi

110 Se 6Th St., 17Th Floor

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Thomas John Patti, III

Attorney at Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi

110 S.E. 6Th Street, Suite 1700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren Marshall Burnette

Attorney at Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd.

12276 San Jose Blvd., Suite 718

Jacksonville, FL 32223

John Michael Marees, II

Attorney at Messer Strickler, LTD.

12276 San Jose Blvd., Suite 718

Jacskonville, FL 32223

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Francisco Gil (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending En Banc Review by the Eleventh Circuit in Hunstein v. Preferred Collection & Management Services, Inc. ; Staying Case; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending En Banc Review by the Eleventh Circuit in Hunstein v. Preferred Collection & Management Services, Inc. ; Staying Case; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Francisco Gil (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending En Banc Review by the Eleventh Circuit in Hunstein v. Preferred Collection & Management Services, Inc. by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Responses due by 2/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#4) PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONSWithin SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges as interested parties unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/18/2022. (eca) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/18/2022. (eca) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Francisco Gil v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15324102, filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burnette, Lauren) (No Answer/ Motion to Dismiss filed) Text Modified on 1/18/2022 (amb). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Michael Marees, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren M. Burnette