This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:11:18 (UTC).

GIDEON v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by GIDEON against BP EXPLORATION PRODUCTION INC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03230

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

M CASEY RODGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL A GIDEON

Defendants

BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR on behalf of BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#5

(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Disclosures by Michael A. Gideon. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Falcon, Jarrett) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 04/01/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#3

(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to provide Initial Disclosures is hereby GRANTED and Plaintiff is allowed thirty (30) days, or until May 1, 2019, within which to provide his Rule 26 Disclosures and Profile Form to counsel for BP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/2/2019. (mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 04/02/2019)

9 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 02/01/2019)

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit BP Election Not to Mediate

#8

(#8) Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/21/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-14310. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

3 #2

Exhibit B

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR on behalf of BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-14310. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/21/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to provide Initial Disclosures is hereby GRANTED and Plaintiff is allowed thirty (30) days, or until May 1, 2019, within which to provide his Rule 26 Disclosures and Profile Form to counsel for BP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/2/2019. (mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Disclosures by Michael A. Gideon. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Falcon, Jarrett) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Filing fee received : $ 400 - 053L-7328679 (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Fee previously paid) filed by Michael A. Gideon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit BP Election Not to Mediate)Attorney Timothy John Falcon added to party Michael A. Gideon(pty:pla).(Falcon, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.