This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2022 at 06:34:27 (UTC).

Gideon v. Auburn University et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 Gideon filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Auburn University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Austin Huffaker, Jr and Stephen Michael Doyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00176

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

R. Austin Huffaker, Jr

Stephen Michael Doyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heather Gideon

Defendants

Auburn University

Tajuan Sellars

Melinda Camus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.

Attorney at McPhillips Shinbaum, L.L.P.

P O Box 64

Montgomery, AL 36101

Kyle David Sawyer

Attorney at McPhillips Shinbaum LLP

516 South Perry Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorneys

Irving W Jones, Jr.

Attorney at Balch & Bingham

1901 6Th Avenue North; Suite 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jordan Dorman Walker, Jr.

Attorney at Balch & Bingham LLP

P O Box 78

Montgomery, AL 36101

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Auburn University, Melinda Camus, Tajuan Sellars. (Walker, Jordan) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#23

(#23) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Heather Gideon. (Sawyer, Kyle) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Irving W Jones, Jr on behalf of Auburn University, Melinda Camus, Tajuan Sellars (Jones, Irving) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#20

(#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 Order, #17 MOTION to Dismiss by Heather Gideon, Auburn University, Tajuan Sellars, Melinda Camus. (McPhillips, Julian) Modified on 5/27/2022 to add joint filers (cwl, ). (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#19

(#19) STANDARD BRIEFING ORDER setting out briefing requirements, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 5/24/2022. (amf, ) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#17

(#17) MOTION to Dismiss by Auburn University, Melinda Camus, Tajuan Sellars. (Walker, Jordan) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#16

(#16) Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. as presiding judge; Chief Judge Emily C. Marks no longer assigned to the case. (bes, ) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#15

(#15) Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (bes, ) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#5

(#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Heather Gideon re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (McPhillips, Julian) Modified on 4/18/2022 to add the link to the #4 notice (amf, ). (Entered: 04/18/2022)

4 #1

Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Heather Gideon. (amf, ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Auburn University, Tajuan Sellars, & Melinda Camus; Returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (amf, ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

1 #4

Filing Fee Receipt

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Auburn University, Melinda Camus, Tajuan Sellars. (Walker, Jordan) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Heather Gideon. (Sawyer, Kyle) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Irving W Jones, Jr on behalf of Auburn University, Melinda Camus, Tajuan Sellars (Jones, Irving) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) TEXT ORDER: The parties' Consent Motion for Extension (Doc. #20 ) is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to the Motion to Dismiss is extended up to and including 6/17/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 5/27/2022. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 Order, #17 MOTION to Dismiss by Heather Gideon, Auburn University, Tajuan Sellars, Melinda Camus. (McPhillips, Julian) Modified on 5/27/2022 to add joint filers (cwl, ). (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STANDARD BRIEFING ORDER setting out briefing requirements, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 5/24/2022. (amf, ) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #17 ) on or by 6/3/2022. Defendant shall file a reply on or by 6/10/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 5/23/2022. (No pdf attached to this entry)(cwl, ) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss by Auburn University, Melinda Camus, Tajuan Sellars. (Walker, Jordan) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. as presiding judge; Chief Judge Emily C. Marks no longer assigned to the case. (bes, ) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (bes, ) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Auburn University, Melinda Camus, Tajuan Sellars; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, ) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFTs) Auburn University, Melinda Camus, Tajuan Sellars. (bes, ) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Auburn University, Melinda Camus, Tajuan Sellars. (Walker, Jordan) Modified on 5/4/2022 to correct event type from extension for response to extension to file answer (bes, ). (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by process server as to Auburn University, Tajuan Sellars, Melinda Camus served on 4/19/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (es, ) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Heather Gideon re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (McPhillips, Julian) Modified on 4/18/2022 to add the link to the #4 notice (amf, ). (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiff Heather Gideon; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Heather Gideon. (amf, ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Auburn University, Tajuan Sellars, & Melinda Camus; Returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (amf, ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Heather Gideon. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Auburn University, Melinda Camus, Tajuan Sellars (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 4602066546), filed by Heather Gideon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auburn University is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan Dorman Walker