This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2020 at 09:08:29 (UTC).

GIBSON v.PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 GIBSON filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher C. Conner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01682

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher C. Conner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Craig Gibson

Defendant

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua P. Ward

Attorney at The Law Firm of Fenters Ward

201 South Highland Avenue, Suite 201

Pittsburgh, PA 15206

Defendant Attorney

Lauren M. Burnette

Attorney at Messer Strickler, Ltd.

12276 San Jose Blvd., Suite 718

Jacksonville, FL 32223

 

Court Documents

#11

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#6

#5

4 #1

Summons

#4

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Middle has been opened in Eastern District of Pennsylvania as case 2:20-cv-04543, filed 09/17/2020. (jw) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER - ORDERED that: 1. The Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/16/2020. (ktt) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-01102 containing electronic documents. (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/14/2020. (ajt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/16/2020.] (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION to Transfer Case by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Burnette, Lauren) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/16/2020.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER approving #6 Stipulation filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. Defendant is given an extension of time to file an answer, due on or before 9/11/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/3/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/16/2020.] (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Burnette, Lauren) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/16/2020.] (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (sdp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/16/2020.] (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by CRAIG GIBSON (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Ward, Joshua) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/16/2020.] (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by CRAIG GIBSON. PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Ward, Joshua) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/16/2020.] (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING PRACTICES ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS, as fully set forth in the attached entry. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/29/2020. (cmc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/16/2020.] (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5757991), filed by CRAIG GIBSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (cel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/16/2020.] (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren M. Burnette