This case was last updated from PACER on 01/06/2020 at 07:14:31 (UTC).

GIBSON v. WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 GIBSON filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T KENT WETHERELL II and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00457

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T KENT WETHERELL II

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MELISSA GIBSON

Defendant

WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCOTT WILLIAM VIETH

Attorney at BOGGS LAW GROUP PA - ST PETERSBURG FL

4554 Central Avenue, Suite L

St Petersburg, FL 33711

AMY D BOGGS

Attorney at BOGGS LAW GROUP PA - ST PETERSBURG FL

4554 Central Avenue, Suite L

St Petersburg, FL 33711

Defendant Attorney

TAYLOR ROBERT RYAN

Attorney at FREEBORN & PETERS LLP - TAMPA FL

201 North Franklin Street, Suite 3550

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER. Based on Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal (Doc. #6 ), it is ORDERED that the Clerk shall close this file pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) (1)(A)(i). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/4/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MELISSA GIBSON (VIETH, SCOTT) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Brown & Brown, Inc., Other Affiliate The Wright Insurance Group, LLC for WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE COMPANY.. (RYAN, TAYLOR) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#4

(#4) Wright National Flood Insurance Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE COMPANY. (RYAN, TAYLOR) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE COMPANY. (sdw) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE Proposed Summons by Melissa Gibson re #1 Complaint (VIETH, SCOTT) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BFLNDC-4692127.), filed by Melissa Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (VIETH, SCOTT) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER. Based on Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal (Doc. #6 ), it is ORDERED that the Clerk shall close this file pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) (1)(A)(i). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/4/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (sdw) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MELISSA GIBSON (VIETH, SCOTT) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #4 Answer to Complaint. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Brown & Brown, Inc., Other Affiliate The Wright Insurance Group, LLC for WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE COMPANY.. (RYAN, TAYLOR) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Wright National Flood Insurance Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE COMPANY. (RYAN, TAYLOR) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE COMPANY. (sdw) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE Proposed Summons by Melissa Gibson re #1 Complaint (VIETH, SCOTT) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BFLNDC-4692127.), filed by Melissa Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (VIETH, SCOTT) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor Robert Ryan