This case was last updated from PACER on 02/21/2021 at 09:33:04 (UTC).

Gibson v. PennyMac Financial Services et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 Gibson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against PennyMac Financial Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Julie S. Sneed and Mary S. Scriven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-03073

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Julie S. Sneed

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Annette Gibson

Riverview, FL 33569

Defendants

PennyMac Financial Services

Private National Mortgage Acceptance Co.

Pennymac Mortgage Investment Trust

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Annette Gibson. (JLD) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Annette Gibson. Related case(s): no (JLD) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#3

(#3) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/28/2021. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/14/2021. (CRB) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#2

(#2) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/28/2021. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/14/2021. (CRB) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PennyMac Financial Services, Pennymac Mortgage Investment Trust, Private National Mortgage Acceptance Co. with Jury Demand filed by Annette Gibson. (Filing Fee Not Paid - No IFP Motion Filed.)(CRH) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Annette Gibson. (JLD) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Annette Gibson. Related case(s): no (JLD) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/28/2021. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/14/2021. (CRB) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/28/2021. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/14/2021. (CRB) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PennyMac Financial Services, Pennymac Mortgage Investment Trust, Private National Mortgage Acceptance Co. with Jury Demand filed by Annette Gibson. (Filing Fee Not Paid - No IFP Motion Filed.)(CRH) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNYMAC MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST HOLDINGS I LLC is a litigant