Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2020 at 11:10:21 (UTC).

Gibbs v. U.S. Auto Sales, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Gibbs filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against U S Auto Sales, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03371

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valerie E. Gibbs

Defendants

Ken Evans

Myron Parker

U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heather C. Wright

Attorney at The Wright Firm, LLC

50 Lenox Pointe, Ne, Suite B

Atlanta, GA 30324

Victoria Kealy

Attorney at The Wright Firm, LLC

50 Lenox Pointe, Ne, Suite B

Atlanta, GA 30324

Defendant Attorney

Anandhi S. Rajan

Attorney at Swift Currie McGhee & Hiers

1355 Peachtree Street, N.E., The Peachtree, Suite 300

Atlanta, GA 30309-3238

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#13

(#13) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ken Evans, U.S. Auto Sales, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent USASF National Corporation, Corporate Parent USASF Holdco LLC, Corporate Parent USASF LLC for Ken Evans, U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.. (Rajan, Anandhi) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 Order, (Rajan, Anandhi) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by U.S. Auto Sales, Inc..(Rajan, Anandhi) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 9/21/2020 to correct filer information (rjs). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ken Evans. Discovery ends on 2/16/2021.(Rajan, Anandhi) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 9/21/2020 to correct filer information (rjs). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Ken Evans. (Kealy, Victoria) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to U.S. Autosales, Inc.. (Kealy, Victoria) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#7

(#7) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/24/2020. (bnp) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#5

(#5) SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Ken Evans. (eop) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Myron Parker. (eop) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Valerie E. Gibbs. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10028081) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/17/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ken Evans, U.S. Auto Sales, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent USASF National Corporation, Corporate Parent USASF Holdco LLC, Corporate Parent USASF LLC for Ken Evans, U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.. (Rajan, Anandhi) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 Order, (Rajan, Anandhi) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by U.S. Auto Sales, Inc..(Rajan, Anandhi) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 9/21/2020 to correct filer information (rjs). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ken Evans. Discovery ends on 2/16/2021.(Rajan, Anandhi) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 9/21/2020 to correct filer information (rjs). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Ken Evans. (Kealy, Victoria) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to U.S. Autosales, Inc.. (Kealy, Victoria) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/24/2020. (bnp) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Ken Evans. (eop) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Myron Parker. (eop) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Valerie E. Gibbs. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10028081) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. AUTO SALES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Victoria Kealy