Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2019 at 07:45:44 (UTC).

Gibbs v. State of Tennessee et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 Gibbs filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against State of Tennessee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan K Lee and Travis R McDonough. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00202

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr.

Chattanooga, TN 37422

Defendants

Chattanooga Police Department

State of Tennessee

C.C.A.'s Well Path Medical

Correct Care Solutions

Officer Ryan Lynn

Hamilton County Jail

Hamilton County

Hamilton County Jail Medical

C.C.A. Employees

Robert DeBusk

Civic Core of America

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) JUDGMENT ORDER. This pro se civil rights action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/29/2019. (AML) J/O mailed to Michael Gibbs (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#15

(#15) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot #14 Motion to Amend/Correct. The instant action is DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff's inability to pay the filing fee in full and thereby reinstate this case. AN APPROPRIATE JUDGMENT WILL ENTER. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/29/2019. (AML) M/O mailed to Michael Gibbs (Entered: 08/29/2019)

14 #1

Other Envelope

#14

(#14) MOTION to Amend Original Complaint by Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BJL) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

13 #1

Other Envelope

#13

(#13) Letter from Michael T. Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AML) Requested forms mailed to Michael Gibbs. (Entered: 07/19/2019)

12 #2

Envelope

12 #1

Cover Letter

#12

(#12) SUPPLEMENT to #11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(BDG) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

11 #1

Envelope

#11

(#11) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BDG) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

10 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) Letter from Michael Terrel Gibbs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (BDG) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#9

(#9) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (BDG)Notice mailed to Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Deficiency (IFP) - The Court is in receipt of your complaint/petition. However, in order for this matter to proceed, you must either pay the required filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. (BJL)*Mailed to Michael Terrell Gibbs, along with an IFP Application and Certificate of Inmate Accounts. (Entered: 06/21/2019)

4 #1

Other Envelope

#4

(#4) Letter from Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope) (BJL) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

3 #1

Other Envelope

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) JUDGMENT ORDER. This pro se civil rights action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/29/2019. (AML) J/O mailed to Michael Gibbs (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot #14 Motion to Amend/Correct. The instant action is DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff's inability to pay the filing fee in full and thereby reinstate this case. AN APPROPRIATE JUDGMENT WILL ENTER. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/29/2019. (AML) M/O mailed to Michael Gibbs (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (GRE) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Amend Original Complaint by Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BJL) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Letter from Michael T. Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AML) Requested forms mailed to Michael Gibbs. (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUPPLEMENT to #11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(BDG) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BDG) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter from Michael Terrel Gibbs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (BDG) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • An email has been sent to US Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee's Chambers for determination as to whether this case is related to 1:17-cv-00004-JRG-SKL Gibbs et al v. State of Tennessee et al (JRG2) and 4:13-cv-00045-HSM-SKL Gibbs v. State of Tennessee et al and other miscellaneous cases (1:19-mc-9 through 1:19-mc-16) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (BDG)Notice mailed to Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Deficiency (IFP) - The Court is in receipt of your complaint/petition. However, in order for this matter to proceed, you must either pay the required filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. (BJL)*Mailed to Michael Terrell Gibbs, along with an IFP Application and Certificate of Inmate Accounts. (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope) (BJL) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter from Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope) (BJL) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Amend/Revise by Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(BJL) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Certificates of Inmate Account by Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(BJL) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hamilton County is a litigant

Latest cases where CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant