This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2020 at 09:33:31 (UTC).

Gibbs et al v. Rees

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 Gibbs filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Rees. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Gibney, Jr and M. Hannah Lauck. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00717

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John A. Gibney, Jr

M. Hannah Lauck

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Darlene Gibbs

Patrick Inscho

Stephanie Edwards

Lawrence Mwethuku

Lula Williams

Defendant

Kenneth Rees

In Re

Think Finance, LLC

Interested Party

USBC-Richmond (United States Bankruptcy Court)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Casey Shannon Nash

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

James Wilson Speer

Attorney at Virginia Poverty Law Center

919 E Main Street, Suite 610

Richmond, VA 23219

Andrew Joseph Guzzo

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Leonard Anthony Bennett

Attorney at Consumer Litigation Associates

763 J Clyde Morris Boulevard, Suite 1A

Newport News, VA 23601

Craig Carley Marchiando

Attorney at Consumer Litigation Associates

763 J Clyde Morris Boulevard, Suite 1A

Newport News, VA 23601

Kristi Cahoon Kelly

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Defendant Attorneys

David Neal Anthony

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP (Richmond)

Troutman Sanders Bldg, 1001 Haxall Point, Po Box 1122

Richmond, VA 23219

Timothy James St. George

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP (Richmond)

Troutman Sanders Bldg, 1001 Haxall Point, Po Box 1122

Richmond, VA 23219

John Michael Erbach

Attorney at Spotts Fain PC

411 E Franklin St, Suite 600

Richmond, VA 23219

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

#23

22 #4

Exhibit Declaration Anna Haac

22 #3

Exhibit Declaration Kristi Kelly

22 #2

Exhibit Declaration Leonard A. Bennett

22 #1

Exhibit Settlement Agreement

#22

4 #1

Part 2

#4

3 #2

Part 3

3 #1

Part 2

#3

#2

1 #2

Certified Docket Report

1 #1

Order

#1

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: *** VIA ZOOM *** Settlement Approval Hearing set for 12/8/2020 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Remote before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (khan, ) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Foster Herman and Certification of Local Counsel John Michael Erbach Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7467647. by Kenneth Rees. (Erbach, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Lawrence Scheff and Certification of Local Counsel John Michael Erbach Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7467646. by Kenneth Rees. (Erbach, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Erbach on behalf of Kenneth Rees (Erbach, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE by Stephanie Edwards, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Lawrence Mwethuku, Lula Williams re #22 Memorandum in Support, Fully Executed Settlement Agreement in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fully Executed Settlement Agreement)(Bennett, Leonard) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION to Certify Class and for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Stephanie Edwards, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Lawrence Mwethuku. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Declaration Leonard A. Bennett, #3 Exhibit Declaration Kristi Kelly, #4 Exhibit Declaration Anna Haac)(Bennett, Leonard) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Certify Class and for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Stephanie Edwards, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Lawrence Mwethuku. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Leonard). PLEASE NOTE: Attachment 1 REPLACED on 10/26/2020 at the request of Counsel for Plaintiffs. NEF regenerated. (walk, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER Granting Motion to Consolidate Cases #18 . The Court hereby consolidates the matters Gibbs v. Rees, Case No. 3:20-cv-00717-MHL; Banks v. Rees, Case No. 8:20-cv-00716-MHL; and Brice v. Rees, Case No. 3:20-cv-00732-MHL for settlement purposes only. Any future filings should be filed in Gibbs v. Rees, Case No. 3:20-cv-00717-MHL while this Order remains in effect. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/23/2020. (asho, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Stephanie Edwards, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Lawrence Mwethuku, Lula Williams. (Bennett, Leonard) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Stephanie Edwards, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Lawrence Mwethuku, Lula Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Leonard) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Supplement Documents 131-163. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4, #4 part 5, #5 part 6)(tjoh, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Supplement Documents 100-130. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4, #4 part 5, #5 part 6, #6 part 7)(tjoh, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Supplement Document 99. (Attachments: #1 Part 2a, #2 Part 2b, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(tjoh, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Supplement Documents 83-98. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4)(tjoh, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Supplement Document 82. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(tjoh, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Supplement Documents 65-81. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Supplement Documents 20-64. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(tjoh, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Supplement Documents 17-19. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3)(tjoh, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Supplemental Documents 1-16. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF TRANSFER FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 1733964hdh11 Northern District of Texas. Adversary No. 1803069hdh. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Certified Docket Report)(tjoh, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Think Finance Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where USBC-Richmond (United States Bankruptcy Court) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Michael Erbach

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David N. Anthony